Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78624
Short Caption:ANTHONY S. NOONAN IRA, LLC VS. U.S. BANK NAT'L ASS'N EECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A710465Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/06/2019 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/24/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/24/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-17913
04/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-17915
04/26/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael N. Beede
04/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-18671
05/06/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (SC).19-19841
05/17/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: June 3, 2019. (SC).19-21772
05/31/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-23772
06/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-24082
06/04/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-24235
06/12/2019Transcript RequestFiled Appellants' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)19-25508
08/27/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 17, 2019. (SC)19-35789
09/17/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix by 7 Days. (SC)19-38832
09/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 24, 2019. (SC).19-39464
09/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-39754
09/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-39758
09/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-39762
09/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)19-39764
09/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)19-39765
09/24/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-39809
10/24/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Respondents' Answering Brief Deadline (First Request). (SC)19-44127
10/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: December 9, 2019. (SC).19-44581
12/09/2019BriefFiled Respondent's' Answering Brief. (SC)19-49860
01/07/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 22, 2020. (SC)20-00813
01/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-03114
01/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-03366
01/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).20-15634
07/09/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Stiglich, J., dissenting. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 41. SNP20-MG/LS/AS (SC)20-25302
07/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Petition for Rehearing due: August 10, 2020. (SC).20-26877