Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78687
Short Caption:PATTERSON (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A786254Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-19145
05/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-20522
05/16/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-21571
05/16/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-12 (via FTP). (SC)19-21572
05/21/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 31 to 32, 73 to 79 and 82 to 83 (SEALED). (SC)
05/21/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 398 to 400, 2296 to 2300, 2301 to 2311, 2335 to 2341 and 2513 to 2517 (SEALED). (SC)
05/21/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 823 to 836 (SEALED). (SC)
07/25/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-31502
09/10/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)