Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78702
Short Caption:BERRY, SR. (WILLIAM) VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36054, 47800, 49014, 52699, 61697, 69186, 69186-COA, 72277, 72277-COA, 78702-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C075095Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/09/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/03/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/03/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-19519
05/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-21238
05/24/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-10 (via FTP). (SC)19-22765
05/30/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 275-287 (SEALED). (SC)
05/30/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1078-1080, 1081, 1111-1112, 1113-1115, 1116, 1117, 1498-1500, 1501, 1539, 1768, 1769-1773, 1774-1775 (SEALED).
06/26/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-27618
08/09/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
09/04/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Confession of Error. (SC)19-37035
09/10/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Confession of Error. (SC)19-37792
09/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion asking this court to treat respondents' failure to file an answering brief as a confession of error and to reverse the district court's order without consideration of the merits of this appeal. The motion is denied. (SC).19-38166
10/04/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice. (SC)19-41170
10/09/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice. (SC)19-41774
10/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion asking this court to take judicial notice of certain facts that are included in the record. The motion is denied. (SC)19-42440
10/18/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Reply to "Respondents' Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice." (SC).19-43319
10/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's reply to respondents' opposition to appellant's request for judicial notice. The request for judicial notice was denied on October 14, 2019. (SC).19-44429
11/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-45193
11/04/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
12/27/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
01/21/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/21/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur.(SC)20-02711
01/21/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
02/12/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 28, 2020. (SC)20-02711