Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78713
Short Caption:SFR INVS. POOL 1, LLC VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A690487Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/08/2019 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-19811
05/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-19815
05/07/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert
05/07/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-20046
05/08/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC).19-20155
05/29/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement (First Request). (SC)19-23411
05/29/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-23412
06/10/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 29, 2019, appellant filed a motion for extension of time to file the docketing statement. Appellant's docketing statement was submitted and filed on May 29, 2019. Accordingly, appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. (SC)19-24951
06/28/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 8, 2019, at 3:00 pm. (SC).19-28039
07/12/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 7, 2019, at 1:30 pm. (SC).19-29748
08/12/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 4, 2019, at 1:30 pm. (SC).19-33793
09/06/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 10/15/19. (SC)19-37380
10/17/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 30, 2019. (SC)19-43085
11/04/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 15, 2019, at 2:00 pm. (SC).19-45299
11/21/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 6, 2019, at 2:00 pm. Parties would greatly appreciate a 90 day extension from the original due date of November 4, 2019, as this property is part of a group of properties that the parties are trying to settle. (SC).19-47828
11/27/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge's recommendation that this appeal remain assigned to the settlement program for an additional 90 days is approved. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by February 3, 2020. (SC)19-48480
12/10/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 3, 2020, at 2:00 pm. (SC).19-49951
01/16/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The parties will need at least 120 days to provide their stipulation of dismissal, as it will take that much time to finalize the settlements in a significant number of cases that are in various stages of litigation and in multiple jurisdictions. (SC)20-02229
01/30/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 120 days. (SC)20-04128
02/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Thera A. Cooper is no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (SC)20-06243
02/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jamie K. Combs of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondent). (SC)20-06244
06/04/2020Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Appellant's Status Report. (SC)20-21131
06/05/2020Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Status Report Until June 4, 2020. (SC)20-21130
06/23/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the status report is granted. The status report was filed on June 4, 2020. (SC).20-23211
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-24104
07/02/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 4, 2020. (SC)20-24539
07/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/05/19; 02/06/19 and 02/07/19. To Court Reporter: Brittany Amoroso. (SC)20-26105
09/22/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Extend the Time to Dismiss the Appeal or File the Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request Since Briefing Reinstated). (SC)20-34855
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 1, 2021. (SC).20-35975
02/01/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-03005
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)21-03006
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)21-03007
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC)21-03008
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC)21-03009
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5. (SC)21-03010
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6. (SC)21-03011
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7. (SC)21-03012
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8. (SC)21-03014
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9. (SC)21-03015
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10. (SC)21-03017
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11. (SC)21-03019
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12. (SC)21-03021
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 13. (SC)21-03022
02/01/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 14. (SC)21-03023
03/01/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Bank of America, N.A.'s Answering Brief. (SC)21-05919
03/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 2, 2021. (SC)21-05922
04/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Joint Notice of Settlement. (SC)21-09547
04/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a joint notice informing this court they have reached a settlement and anticipate seeking to dismiss this appeal within 60 days. Motion or stipulation to dismiss due: June 1, 2021. (SC)21-10438
05/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Lilith V. Xara of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-14994
05/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Jamie K. Combs and Rex D. Garner are no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (SC)21-14999
06/01/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-15476
06/02/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-15600