Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78714
Short Caption:SFR INVS. POOL 1, LLC VS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A703333Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/08/2019 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-19817
05/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-19819
05/07/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert
05/07/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-20049
05/08/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC).19-20157
05/31/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC).19-23721
06/10/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-25129
06/28/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 8, 2019, at 2:30 pm. (SC).19-28038
07/12/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-29747
07/17/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-30320
07/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC).19-31445
08/26/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)19-35553
08/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC).19-36397
11/29/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)19-48593
12/02/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice- Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 2, 2020. (SC)19-48717
12/31/2019MotionFiled Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC)19-52513
01/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 3, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-01074
02/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Briefing and Set Status Check. (SC)20-04558
02/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Rex D. Garner, Esq. of the law firm of Akerman LLP, files this notice of appearance for Respondent. (SC)20-05260
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix or Motion or Stipulation to Dismiss due: 90 days. (SC).20-06121
05/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Joint Motion to Set Status Report and Continue Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-16862
05/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties' joint motion to vacate the briefing schedule and to set a status check is granted as follows. Appellant shall have until August 11, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix or a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal. (SC)20-18257
06/09/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/20/18 To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. (SC)20-21695
07/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Disassociation. (SC)20-25001
08/10/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Set Status Report and Continue Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-29420
08/10/2020MotionFiled Amended Joint Motion to Set Status Report and Continue Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-29429
08/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix or motion/stipulation to dismiss due: November 9, 2020. (SC)20-30697
11/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-40999
11/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-41000
11/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 (SC)20-41001
11/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 (SC)20-41002
11/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4 (SC)20-41004
11/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5 (SC)20-41005
11/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6 (SC)20-41006
12/09/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-44727
01/08/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief (First Request). (SC)21-00605
01/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's reply brief due: February 8, 2021. (SC)21-00930
02/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Rex D. Garner is no longer associated with the law Firm of Akerman LLP). (SC)21-03604
02/08/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-03728
02/08/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/24/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-14766
05/24/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-14795