Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78733
Short Caption:BENJAMIN (RONICIA) VS. WARDEN C/W 78734Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:78733*, 78734Related Case(s):49191, 49192, 78734
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061649Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/23/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/08/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-20100
06/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Transmission of Records, and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-24002
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (Case No. 78733). (SC)19-24360
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2). (Case No. 78733). (SC)19-24363
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3). (Case No. 78733). (SC)19-24364
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (Case No. 78734). (SC)19-24420
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2) (Case No. 78734). (SC)19-24422
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3) (Case No. 78734). (SC)19-24425
06/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 4 (SEALED). Nos. 78733/78734. (SC)
06/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Document - PSI Report (SEALED). Nos. 78733/78734. (SC)
07/08/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. Nos. 78733/78734. (SC)19-28967
08/23/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision (SC)