Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78746
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. DAVISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A758156Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/17/2020 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:09/17/2020How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/09/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
05/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-20343
05/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)19-20345
05/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel and Directing Transmission of Record. Having considered the documents transmitted by the district court, this court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. This case is hereby referred to the program established by the Pro Bono Committee to evaluate whether appellant can benefit from the program. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance due: 60 days; Record on Appeal due: 30 days. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC).19-22939
05/29/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SC)19-23291
05/29/2019Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/28/18, 03/07/19, 03/08/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC).19-23390
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 157-159, 162-163 (SEALED). (SC)
06/05/2019Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)19-24319
06/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel (Michael K. Wall for Appellant). (SC)19-27626
06/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief due: 90 days. fn1[No action will be taken on the pro se transcript request form filed on May 29, 2019.] (SC)19-27948
09/25/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-39952
09/25/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)19-39957
10/15/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/16/19). (SC)
10/16/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief due by October 28, 2019. (SC)19-42737
10/16/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-42844
10/16/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume I. (SC)19-42845
10/17/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. (SC)19-43028
10/17/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Amended Answering Brief Volume 1. (SC)19-43029
11/14/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-46760
11/15/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
08/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this appeal is scheduled for oral argument on September 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 10 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. It is so ORDERED. (SC)20-29542
09/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-32343
09/17/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 78746. (SNP20-MG/LS/AS) (SC)
11/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand. We remand this matter for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to consider and enter an order resolving Williams' motion . The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to enter its written decision and to transmit that decision to this court. (SC)20-42567
12/17/2020MotionFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on December 17, 2020. Requests an Extension of Time in Regards to Order dated 11/23/2020 - A758156. (SC)20-45661
12/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The district court shall have 45 days from the date of this order to consider and enter an order resolving appellant's motion for relief and to transmit that decision to this court. (SC)20-45849
01/27/2021MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File District Court Order. (SC)21-02570
02/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The district court shall have 60 days from the date of this order to consider and enter an order resolving appellant's motion for relief and to transmit that decision to this court. (SC)21-03628
02/24/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Entry of Order by District Court in Response to Limited Remand. (SC)21-05432
02/25/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Order Granting Motion for Relief in Response to Limited Remand, filed in district court on February 23rd, 2021. (SC)21-05546
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Remanding and Dismissing Appeal. "We remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with its February 23, 2021, order, and we dismiss this appeal." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13896
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16303
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16303