Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78764
Short Caption:VALENTI (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C332204Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/13/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-20769
05/28/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/23/18, 07/18/18, 08/13/18, 09/10/18, 09/14/18, 09/17/18, 09/18/18, 11/14/18, 12/03/18, 02/04/19, 02/07/19, 02/11/19, 02/12/19, 02/13/19, 02/14/19, 02/15/19, 02/19/19, 02/20/19, 03/20/19, 04/10/19, and 04/29/19. To Court Reporter: Sharon Nichols, Lara Corcoran, and Michelle Ramsey. (SC)19-23173
06/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-24076
07/05/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/23/18. (SC)19-28686
07/12/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/08/18, 08/13/18, 09/10/18, 09/17/18, 09/18/18, 11/14/18, 12/03/18, 02/04/19, 02/07/19, 02/11/19, 02/12/19, 02/13/19, 02/14/19, 02/15/19, 02/19/19, 02/20/19, 03/20/19, 04/10/19, 04/29/19. (SC)19-29701
09/06/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-37445
09/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 10, 2019. (SC)19-37450
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol I. (SC)19-42012
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol II. (SC)19-42013
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol III. (SC)19-42016
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol IV. (SC)19-42017
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol V. (SC)19-42018
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol VI. (SC)19-42019
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol VII. (SC)19-42022
10/10/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol VIII. (SC)19-42023
10/10/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-42092
11/12/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-46375
12/11/2019MotionFiled Stipulaton to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-50211
12/11/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 13, 2020. (SC)19-50253
01/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-01013
01/09/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-14082
06/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16787
06/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 14, 2021. (SC)21-16787