Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78770
Short Caption:S. NEV. ADULT MENTAL HEALTH SERVS. VS. BROWNCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67931
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A706095Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/14/2019 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/10/2021 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/10/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
05/13/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-20872
05/13/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-20878
05/14/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC).19-21064
05/23/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Heidi Parry Stern for Appellant). (SC)19-22670
05/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Notice of Appearance). (SC)19-22741
05/28/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proof or Service - Notice of Appearance served on Settlement Judge. (SC)19-22947
05/28/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-23058
05/29/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-23279
06/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-23951
06/12/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 16-18, 2018; October 23-24, 2018; and October 29 - November 1, 2018. To Court Reporter: Jennifer Gerold and Shawna Ortega. (SC)19-25379
07/11/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 10, 2019. (SC)19-29474
09/10/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-37922
09/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Amended Docketing Statement. Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement due: 14 days. Briefing is suspended. fn1[The motion for extension of time filed on September 10, 2019, is denied as moot.] (SC)19-37952
09/25/2019Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-39968
12/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC)19-49370
01/31/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 18, 2020. (SC)20-04451
02/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-06690
02/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 25, 2020. (SC).20-07355
02/25/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-07664
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC).20-07667
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC).20-07668
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC).20-07669
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC).20-07670
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC).20-07671
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC).20-07672
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC).20-07673
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC).20-07674
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC).20-07675
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC).20-07676
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. (SC).20-07677
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. (SC).20-07678
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. (SC).20-07679
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. (SC).20-07680
02/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15. (SC).20-07681
02/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16. (SC).20-07682
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Opening Brief. (SC).20-08991
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. (SC).20-08993
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. (SC).20-08994
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. (SC).20-08995
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. (SC).20-08996
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. (SC).20-08997
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 6. (SC).20-08998
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 7. (SC).20-09037
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 8. (SC).20-09038
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 9. (SC).20-09039
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10. (SC).20-09040
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 11. (SC).20-09041
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 12. (SC).20-09042
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 13. (SC).20-09043
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 14. (SC).20-09044
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 15. (SC).20-09055
03/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix, Volume 16. (SC).20-09056
03/26/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 9, 2020. (SC).20-11634
03/31/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).20-12345
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: May 11, 2020. 9SC).20-13674
05/11/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/11/20). (SC)
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. Vols. 1 - 3. (SC)20-17717
05/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Answering Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-17867
05/14/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. (SC)20-18378
06/10/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 29, 2020. (SC)20-21804
06/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-24064
07/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 13, 2020. (SC)20-27232
08/13/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-30031
08/14/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Daniel Polsenberg and Abraham G. Smith. (SC)20-46928
02/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 10, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-03399
02/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-05397
02/24/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-05525
03/05/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Response to Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-06533
03/10/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. EC/KP/DH (SC)
07/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision After Oral Argument. Cause appearing, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order. (SC)21-21237