Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78775
Short Caption:MARTINEZ (DAVID) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A773450Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/14/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-21051
05/16/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Jaimie Stilz, Deputy Attorney General in place of Ashley A. Balducci as counsel for Respondent). (SC)19-21630
06/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).19-23995
06/07/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-24723
07/16/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-30093
07/17/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Change of Address. (SC)19-30303
08/22/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Informal Opening Brief. (SC)19-35221
08/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 29, 2019. (SC).19-35482
08/29/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Informal Opening Brief. (SC)19-36352
09/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 29, 2019, respondent filed a motion to withdraw the motion for an extension of time to file a response to the informal brief. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order. (SC)19-37757
09/10/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)