Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78791
Short Caption:HEARRING, JR. (FRANK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790102Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/02/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-21514
05/24/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Motion Judicial Notice. (SC)19-22804
05/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Opening Brief of Informal Brief due: 120 days. fn1[Appellant has filed a motion requesting this court take note of a technical correction that appellant has made on page 16 of his petition for writ of habeas corpus filed in the district court. Once the record on appeal is filed in this court, the correction will be noted.] (SC)19-23491
05/31/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)19-23710
05/31/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1 PART 1. (SC)19-23711
05/31/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 2. (SC)19-23715
05/31/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 3. (SC)19-23717
06/06/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Pre-Sentence Investigation Report - pages 222 thru 228 (SEALED). (SC)
06/18/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-26252
08/02/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)