Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78891
Short Caption:HECHAVARRIA-CORREA (ISRAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790100Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/05/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/03/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - Criminal. (SC)
06/03/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-24016
06/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 568 to 576 and 578 to 579 (SEALED). (SC)
06/13/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 511 to 523 (SEALED). (SC)
06/19/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 29, 2019. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (SC)19-26580
06/20/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-26608
06/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC)19-27260
06/28/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1 PART 1. (SC)19-27844
06/28/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-5 (Related case C315240) (Via FTP). (SC)19-27929
07/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 321-328 (SEALED). (SC).
07/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 887-890 and 929-930 (SEALED). (SC).
08/05/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).