Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78923
Short Caption:TRASHED HOME CORP. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78923-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A710011Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-24538
06/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-24540
06/17/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hong & Hong. Check no. 3295. (SC)
06/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-26090
06/18/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-26392
07/02/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC).19-28409
07/08/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 22, 2019. (SC).19-28960
07/22/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-30884
10/15/2019MotionFiled Stipulation For Time Extension For Trashed Home Corporation To File Its Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC)19-42718
10/16/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 15, 2019. (SC)19-42940
11/15/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).19-47031
11/15/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC).19-47032
11/15/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC).19-47033
11/15/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC).19-47034
12/10/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-50090
12/11/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 15, 2020. (SC)19-50146
01/14/2020MotionFiled Respondent's First Motion for Time Extension for Answering Brief. (SC)20-01873
01/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 14, 2020. (SC).20-03023
02/14/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-06334
02/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume I. (SC)20-06337
02/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume II. (SC)20-06338
02/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume III. (SC)20-06339
03/10/2020MotionFiled Stipulation For Time Extension For Trashed Home Corporation's Reply Brief. (SC)20-09549
03/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 15, 2020. (SC)20-09670
04/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion To Extend Time To File Reply Brief. (SC)20-13936
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 15, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-14232
05/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion To Extend Time To File Reply Brief. (SC)20-18232
05/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 15, 2020. (SC).20-19300
06/15/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-22355
06/16/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)20-25370
07/09/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
10/23/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. " We reverse the judgement in favor of BOA and remand this matter for the district court to address the parties' equitable arguments in the first instance." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
11/24/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Review (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/30/20). (SC)
11/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondent's Petition for Review. (SC)20-43202
11/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review. (SC)20-43358
12/02/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a petition for review. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)20-44351
12/08/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Review. (SC)20-44699
12/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Appellant's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)20-46357
01/06/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Review. (SC)21-00353
01/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's answer due: January 20, 2021. (SC)21-00655
01/20/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Review. (SC)21-01696
01/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for a second extension of time to file an answer to the petition for review is granted. Appellant shall have until February 4, 2021, to file the answer. (SC)21-02380
02/04/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Review. (SC)21-03507
02/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Answer due: February 11, 2021. (SC).21-03865
02/09/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC)21-03951
03/05/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review. Our review will be based on the record and briefs previously filed. EN BANC (SC)21-06439
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating Judgment and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC (SC)21-10281
05/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12700
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12700