Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78984
Short Caption:NAT'L GOLD MINING CORP. VS. HYGRADE GOLD CO. LTD. C/W 78685Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:78685*, 78984Related Case(s):78685, 79350
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV0019112Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/18/2019 / Clark, J.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/17/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Parsons Behle & Latimer. Check no. 9309. (SC)
06/17/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-26130
06/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-26132
06/18/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeal Case Nos. 78685 & 78984. (SC)19-26256
06/18/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: J. Douglas Clark. (SC).19-26327
07/02/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 15, 2019, at 9:00 am. Case Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).19-28424
07/08/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 07/09/19). (SC)
07/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Docketing Statement). (SC)19-29095
07/09/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-29122
08/09/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Hygrade Gold Company Ltd., F/K/A RJT Whelchel Development Company's Suggestion of Death of Bettly J. Whelchel.19-33645
08/15/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).19-34440
08/15/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Daniel Hayward is no longer representing Respondent) (SC).19-34445
08/20/2019MotionFiled Respondent Hygrade Gold Company, Ltd's Reply in Support of Motion to Substitute Proper Party. (SC)19-34941
08/21/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/28/17, 06/28/17, 06/30/17. To Court Reporter: Julie Rowan (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 08/22/19). (SC)
08/22/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Transcript Request). (SC)19-35305
08/23/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (John P. Rutledge for Respondent Hygrade Gold Company Ltd.). (SC)19-35364
08/23/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Concluding Settlement Proceedings. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. The settlement proceedings are concluded. Briefing and the requesting of transcripts shall remain suspended, however, pending further order of this court. (SC).19-35403
08/27/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-35882
10/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Respondent has filed a motion to substitute the State of Nevada as the Special Administrator for the Estate of Betty J. Whelchel in place of Betty J. Whelchel. This court grants the motion. The clerk of this court shall substitute "the State of Nevada ex officio as Public Administrator of the Estate of Betty Whelchel" in place of Betty Whelchel on this court's docket, and shall amend the caption in these consolidated appeals accordingly. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).19-41962
10/10/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Certificate of Service (Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motion). Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)19-42043
11/20/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Robert L. Eisenberg and Todd R. Alexander of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg in place of Ryan Leary of Laxalt & Normura, Ltd. as counsel for Respondent). Nos. 78685/78984.(SC)19-47440
02/11/2020MotionFiled The State of Nevada Ex Officio as Public Administrator of the Estate of Betty Whelchel's Notice of Dismissal of Appeal. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-05682
03/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The motion filed by the State of Nevada Ex Officio as Public Administrator for the estate of appellant Betty Whelchel for a voluntary dismissal of appeal is granted as follows. The appeal in Docket No. 78685 is dismissed as to "State Of Nevada Ex Officio as Public Administrator of the Estate Of Betty J. Whelchel, Deceased, Widow To William E. Whelchel" only. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-10372
04/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Combined Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-14745
04/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER 04/28/20 NOTICE). Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).
04/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER 04/28/20 NOTICE). Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).
04/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).20-16087
04/30/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/28/17, 06/29/17, 04/28/17. To Court Reporter: Julie Rowan. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).20-16465
06/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Rowan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/28/17, 06/29/17, 04/28/17. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-22383
07/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant National Gold Mining Corp.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-24798
07/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant National Gold Mining Corp.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-24801
07/07/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Limited Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).20-25002
07/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).20-25043
07/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).20-25044
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 4, 2020. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC).20-26151
09/04/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32848
09/04/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32849
09/04/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume III. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32850
09/04/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume II. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32851
09/04/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume IV. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32852
09/04/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume V. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32853
09/04/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VI. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-32854
09/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss National Gold Mining Corp's Appeal as Moot. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-33431
09/15/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 78685/78984 (SC)20-33938
09/15/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion Request to Suspend Briefing Scheduling. Nos. 78685/78984 (SC)20-33942
09/17/2020MotionFiled National Gold Mining Corp.'s Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss National Gold Mining Corp.'s Appeal as Moot. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-34353
09/22/2020MotionFiled National Gold Mining Corp.'s Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Neil Whelchel's Appeal. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-34917
09/22/2020MotionFiled National Gold Mining Corp.'s Response to Respondent's Request to Suspend Briefing Schedule Until Court Rules on Pending Motions to Dismiss. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-34918
09/22/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss National Gold Mining Corp.'s Appeal as Moot. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-34922
09/25/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Neil Whelchel's Appeal as Untimely and Moot. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-35408
09/25/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Request to Suspend Briefing Schedule. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-35409
10/01/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension for Answering Brief. (SC)20-36153
10/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Having considered the arguments of the parties, it appears that the issues are substantially intertwined with the merits of the appeal and are not appropriate for resolution on a motion to dismiss. The motion is denied. At this point, this court declines to dismiss the appeal as to Neil Whelchel, but reserves its right to consider the questions of standing and mootness as the appeal progresses. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. fn1 [Respondent's motion to suspend the briefing schedule is denied as moot.] Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-36227
11/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/02/20). (SC)
11/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected answering brief due: 5 days. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-39910
11/03/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-39947
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-39955
12/01/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant National Gold Mining Corp. shall have until December 17, 2020, to file and serve its reply brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-43472
12/17/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-45764
12/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)20-45765
12/18/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)21-10913
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)21-18903
07/09/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing due: August 2, 2021. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)21-19705
08/02/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)21-22415
08/02/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Ashley C. Nikkel. (SC)
08/16/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)21-23722
08/30/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)Y21-25254
09/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. Nos. 78685/78984. (SC)21-27058