Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 78994
Short Caption:FOX (DEREK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C318410Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-26422
06/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SC)19-26423
06/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days (SC)19-26425
07/24/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing the Filing of Required Documents. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement, Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC).19-31179
08/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 due: 14 days or Case Appeal Statement, Transcript Request Form, and Docketing Statement or: Motion due: 14 days. (SC)19-36464
09/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-36981
09/04/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-37051
09/05/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 09/05/19). (SC)
09/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request.19-37158
09/05/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/07/19, 03/08/19, 03/13/19, 05/07/18, 05/28/19 (Melissa Murphy-Delgado); 03/11/19, 03/12/19 (Sandra Pruchnic). (SC)19-37179
10/29/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Court Reporter's Letter in Regards to Transcripts. (SC).19-44445
11/13/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Appoint Appellate Counsel or, Alternatively Motion to Withdraw as Appellate Counsel. (SC)19-46599
12/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Proof of Service. Attorney Mueller shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file proof of service of the motion to withdraw on appellant. (SC)19-48893
12/13/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Motion to Withdraw As Attorney Of Record Served on Appellant Derek Fox. (SC)19-50691
01/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, Remanding for the Appointment of Counsel, and Suspending Briefing. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Craig A. Mueller and Mueller & Associates as counsel of record for appellant. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 37 days. The schedule for requesting transcripts and briefing in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)20-00293
02/21/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on February 20, 2020 appointing Daniel Bunin as counsel for appellant. (SC).20-07229
03/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. fn1[Should newly appointed counsel require the production of additional transcripts, counsel shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts.] (SC)20-09771
03/19/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/7/19, 3/8/19, 3/13/19, 5/7/19, 5/28/19. To Court Reporter: Melissa Murphy Murphy-Delgado. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-10875
03/19/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/11/19, 3/12/19. To Court Reporter: Sandra Pruchnic. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-10876
04/29/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Melissa Murphy-Delgado stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/07/19, 03/08/19, 03/11/19, 03/12/19, 03/13/19, 05/07/19 and 05/28/19. (SC)20-16204
04/30/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Counsel. (SC)20-16414
05/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court takes no action on appellant's letter, and trusts that counsel will communicate with appellant as necessary. The opening brief and appendix remain due to be filed on or before July 10, 2020. (SC).20-17059
06/18/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Counsel. (SC)20-22762
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This is an appeal from a judgment of conviction. Appellant has filed a second letter again expressing concern that his appointed counsel has not communicated with him. This court takes no action on appellant's letter at this time, but admonishes counsel to communicate with appellant as necessary. The opening brief and appendix remain due by July 10, 2020. (SC)20-24734
07/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Application for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC)20-25240
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 8, 2020. (SC).20-26141
07/28/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Counsel. (SC)20-27390
08/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court takes no action on appellant's letter at this time. The opening brief and appendix remain due by September 8, 2020. (SC)20-28801
09/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/9/2020) (SC)
09/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-33192
09/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request) (SC)20-34931
09/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-34932
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 (SC)20-34935
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time file to file the opening brief is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The opening brief and appendix were filed on September 22, 2020. Respondent's answering brief due: October 22, 2020. (SC)20-36081
10/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler. (SC)20-38683
10/22/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-38684
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-38685
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2 (SC)20-38686
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3 (SC)20-38687
11/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: December 7, 2020. (SC)20-42693
12/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-44454
12/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume I-5. (SC)20-44463
12/08/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP20 - RP/JH/EC (SC)21-11426
05/17/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14132
05/17/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 18, 2021. (SC)21-14132