Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79055
Short Caption:LAS VEGAS DEV. GRP., LLC VS. BLAHACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71875
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A715532Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/26/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-27416
06/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-27419
07/08/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates. Check no. 22379. (SC)
07/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-29072
07/09/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-29209
07/10/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).19-29247
07/11/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/24/19. To Court Reporter: Kimberly Farkas. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC)19-29521
07/11/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kolesar & Leatham. Check no. 5814. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
07/11/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC)19-29617
07/23/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/17/19. To Court Reporter: Kimberly Farkas. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants). (SC)19-30970
07/29/2019Docketing StatementFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-31862
10/25/2019MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Stay Appeal and to Hold All Deadlines in Abeyance. (SC)19-44150
11/01/2019MotionFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Response to Appellant's Motion to Stay and to Hold All Deadlines in Abeyance. (SC)19-45023
11/01/2019MotionFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Certificate of Mailing (Response to Appellant's Motion to Stay and to Hold All Deadlines in Abeyance). (SC)19-45036
11/01/2019MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply to Response to Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal and to Hold all Deadlines in Abeyance. (SC)19-45084
11/20/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kimberly Farkas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/17/19 and 04/24/19. (SC)19-47436
12/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed a motion to hold this appeal in abeyance and to suspend the briefing schedule. The motion is granted. The deadlines for briefing in the instant appeal and cross-appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a status report regarding the state of the proceedings in Jessup. (SC).19-49299
02/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Status Report. (SC)20-04612
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed the status report and notes that this court has not yet disposed of Jessup. Accordingly the deadlines for briefing in the instant appeal and cross-appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. Status Report due: 60 days. (SC).20-05973
03/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm and Address (Law Firm Maurice Wood). (SC).20-10720
04/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Status Report. (SC)20-13790
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a status report regarding the state of the proceedings in Jessup. (SC)20-14340
05/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Status Report. (SC)20-18512
05/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. (SC)20-19049