Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79069
Short Caption:PETROCELLI (TRACY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-DIRECT)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):47168
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - C82740Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/27/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/27/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-27663
06/27/2019OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. (SC)
06/29/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (John Reese Petty for Appellant). (SC)19-28120
07/01/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-28 (Via FTP). (SC)19-28247
07/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 29 (SEALED). (SC).
07/08/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC).
07/12/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-29823
10/29/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)19-44495
11/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: December 2, 2019. (SC)19-45199
12/02/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)19-48732
12/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: January 2, 2020. (SC).19-50340
12/31/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)19-52507
01/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 3, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief. (SC)20-01054
01/31/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-04472
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume One. (SC)20-04473
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Two. (SC)20-04474
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Three. (SC)20-04475
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Four. (SC)20-04477
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Five. (SC)20-04478
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Six. (SC)20-04479
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Seven. (SC)20-04480
01/31/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Eight. (SC)20-04481
03/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-12004
03/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 30, 2020. (SC).20-12319
04/29/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-16255
05/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: June 1, 2020. (SC).20-17053
06/01/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)20-20599
06/01/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Order for Transmission of Exhibits. (SC)20-20603
06/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. (SC)20-20605
06/01/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-20613
06/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Issued in error). (SC)
06/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report and Original Exhibits. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the presentence investigation report in a sealed envelope and original exhibits BP2 and CP2. (SC)20-21770
06/26/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)
07/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-26106
07/22/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed. (SC)
05/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] Herndon, J., with whom Parraguirre, J. agrees, dissenting- EN BANC. (SC)21-14708
06/15/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17158
06/15/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 16, 2021. (SC)21-17158