Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 79140
Short Caption:OUSLEY (BRYON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C336019Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/10/2021 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/10/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/11/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-29436
07/25/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/08/18 (Sharon Nichols); 11/27/18, 12/06/18, 12/11/18, 12/13/18, 01/02/19, 01/15/19, 01/24/19, 02/05/19, 02/12/19, 02/19/19, 03/12/19, 04/02/19, 04/08/19, 04/09/19, 04/10/19, 04/11/19, 05/30/19, 06/04/19, 06/11/19 (Cynthia Georgilas). (SC)19-31592
07/26/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-31717
08/29/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/08/18. (SC).19-36233
09/09/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cynthia Georgilas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/27/18, 12/06/18, 12/11/18, 12/13/18, 01/02/19, 01/15/19, 01/24/19, 02/05/19, 02/12/19, 02/19/19, 03/12/19, 04/02/19, 04/08/19, 04/09/19, 04/10/19, 04/11/19, 05/30/19, 06/04/19, 06/11/19. (SC)19-37487
11/06/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-45638
11/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 9, 2019. (SC)19-45673
12/09/2019MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-49877
12/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until January 21, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-51359
01/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-02902
01/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Addendum to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief Filed 01-21-20. (SC)20-03056
02/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 9, 2020. (SC)20-05111
03/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-09302
03/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 8, 2020. (SC).20-10807
04/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brilef Due to Missing Portion of DC Record. (SC).20-13095
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 18, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-14259
05/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for 30 Day Extension of Time To File Opening Brief Due to Missing Portion of DC Record. (SC)20-18882
06/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 17, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-21026
06/17/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Thirty Day Extension of Time to Fie Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-22653
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 17, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-24735
07/17/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-26258
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. I. (SC)20-28285
08/03/2020AppendixFiled DUPLICATE Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. I. (SC)20-28297
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. II. (SC)20-28300
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. III. (SC)20-28304
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. IV. (SC)20-28306
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. V. (SC)20-28307
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. VI. (SC)20-28312
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. VII. (SC)20-28313
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. VIII. (SC)20-28315
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. IX. (SC)20-28316
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. X. (SC)20-28319
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. XI. (SC)20-28320
08/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-28325
08/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on July 17, 2020, is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on August 3, 2020. Respondent shall have until September 2, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-28406
09/02/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance (John Niman) (SC)20-32330
09/02/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief . (SC)20-32331
09/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 2, 2020. (SC)20-32928
10/01/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-35994
10/21/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for an Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-38556
10/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date is December 2, 2020. (SC)20-38559
12/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC)20-43696
12/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-43702
12/03/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/07/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC)20-44250
12/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to State's Response to Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit. (SC)20-44432
12/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Amended Reply to State's Response to Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit. (SC)20-44467
12/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion requesting this court to direct the district court clerk to transmit original exhibits. The motion is granted as follows. The district court clerk shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit Exhibit #24 and Exhibit #25 in the underlying case no. C-18-336019-1. (SC)20-47027
05/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 10, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)21-13010
05/27/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-15214
06/10/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 79140. (SNP21-RP/LS/AS) (SC)
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating Judgement of Conviction and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of conviction VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-21278
08/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-23247
08/10/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
08/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-24439
09/02/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-25566
09/02/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Portions of State's Answer to Bryon's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-25643
09/03/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Portions of the State's Answer to Bryon's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-25742
09/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to strike portions of respondent's answer to the petition for rehearing. Respondent opposes the motion. Having considered the documents, the motion is denied. (SC)21-27878
09/30/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-28118
10/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibits 24 & 25. (SC)21-30874
10/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)