Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79208
Short Caption:NEVADA STATE EDUC. ASS'N VS. CLARK CTY. EDUC. ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A761364Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Parraguirre for Senior Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/23/2019 / Haire, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/12/2020 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:11/12/2020How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
07/19/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-30641
07/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-30643
07/22/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Boies Schiller Flexner. Check no. 3982. (SC)
07/23/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC).19-30995
07/24/2019Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 46 Notice of Appearance Re: Robert Alexander for Appellants and Request for Special Notice. (SC)19-31305
07/25/2019Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 46 Notice of Appearance Re: Matthew Clash-Drexler for Appellants and Request for Special Notice. (SC)19-31462
07/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance Attorney Richard R. Pocker appearing as counsel for appellants. (SC)19-31661
08/08/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Debbie Leonard in place of Richard J. Pocker and Paul J. Lal for Appellants). (SC)19-33428
08/09/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-33589
09/12/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Associate Counsel (Request for an order permitting Georgina Catherine Yeomans to practice in Nevada). (SC)19-38279
09/22/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-39416
10/04/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel, Removing Appeal from Settlement Program, and Reinstating Briefing. Attorney Georgina Catherine Yeomans shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants in this matter. Nevada attorney Debbie Leonard of the law firm Leonard Law, PC, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Yeomans in this matter. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)19-41203
10/17/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)19-43126
10/22/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-43734
10/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief due: February 3, 2020. (SC)19-43842
02/03/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-04602
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. (SC)20-04610
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. (SC)20-04613
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. (SC)20-04616
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV. (SC)20-04617
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. (SC)20-04618
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI. (SC)20-04626
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII. (SC)20-04629
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. (SC)20-04630
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IX. (SC)20-04633
02/11/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-05704
02/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 3, 2020. (SC)20-05801
02/24/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Seal (Portions of Appellant's Appendix). (SC).20-07379
02/25/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Non-Opposition to Motion to Seal. (SC).20-07549
03/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion for leave to file a portion of the appendix containing bank statements under seal. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC).20-08785
04/01/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Renewed Motion to Seal. (SC).20-12458
04/01/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Andrew Jacobs and Kelly Dove for Respondents. (SC)20-12516
04/03/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-12795
04/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. I. (SC)20-12796
04/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. II. (SC)20-12797
04/06/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Non-Opposition to Renewed Motion to Seal. (SC).20-12951
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the portion of the appendix received on April 6, 2020, under seal. (SC)20-14260
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume V (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 4/15/20).
04/29/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 18, 2020. (SC)20-16163
05/18/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-18851
05/19/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellants. (Matthew Clash-Drexler) (SC)20-34594
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Debbie Leonard, counsel for appellants, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellants. The motion is purportedly made on behalf of attorney Matthew Clash-Drexler, who is also counsel for appellants, but is not signed by Mr. Clash-Drexler. Under these circumstances, the motion is treated as requesting that Mr. Clash-Drexler be removed as counsel of record for appellants. The motion is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Clash-Drexler as counsel of record for appellants. (SC)20-34966
10/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on November 12, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)20-36690
10/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-39677
11/12/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 78996. (SNP20-MG/LS/AS). (SC)
03/04/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. SNP20-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-06306
03/29/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-08852
03/29/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
04/09/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 31, 2021. (SC)21-08852