Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79218
Short Caption:TAYLOR (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65388
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C270343Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/30/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/22/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/22/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-30857
08/07/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of Non-Filing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)19-33243
08/12/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-33750
11/20/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 3, 2019. (SC)19-47448
12/03/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-49056
12/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 2, 2020. (SC).19-49917
12/24/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Opening Brief in Excess of 14,000 Words. (SC)19-52103
01/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) (REJECTED PER 01/09/20 ORDER).
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. (SC)20-00199
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. (SC)20-00200
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. (SC)20-00201
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV. (SC)20-00202
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. (SC)20-00203
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI. (SC)20-00204
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII. (SC)20-00205
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. (SC)20-00206
01/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IX. (SC)20-00207
01/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the 14,000-word limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk shall reject the opening brief filed on January 2, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief due: 21 days. (SC).20-01066
01/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-04189
02/26/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).20-07801
03/27/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-11920
03/30/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)