Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79234
Short Caption:NV REAL PROP. LLC VS. BAC HOME LOANS SERV., LPCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69142
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A710490Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/25/2019 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/23/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-31085
07/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-31087
07/24/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael N. Beede. (SC)
07/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-31250
07/25/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC).19-31559
08/06/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 11, 2019, at 2:00 pm. (SC)19-33026
08/15/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: August 28, 2019. (SC).19-34328
08/28/2019Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals - Volume 1. (SC)19-36037
08/28/2019Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals - Volume 2. (SC)19-36040
09/16/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-38624
09/20/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-39334
09/26/2019Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript Is Requested. (SC).19-40015
12/13/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 2, 2019. (SC).19-50656
01/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix by 30 Days. (SC)20-00043
01/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 3, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-00801
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)20-04677
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC)20-04679
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC)20-04680
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC)20-04681
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC)20-04682
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC)20-04683
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC)20-04685
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC)20-04686
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC)20-04688
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC)20-04689
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. (SC)20-04690
02/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. (SC)20-04691
02/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-04730
03/04/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-08673
03/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Rex Garner as counsel for Respondent). (SC)20-09241
04/03/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 17, 2020. (SC).20-12725
04/17/2020MotionFiled Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Appellant's Reply Brief by 30 Days. (SC)20-14747
04/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 18, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-15082
05/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-18928
05/19/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice Of Disassociation. (SC)20-24197
07/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)20-25535
07/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)20-27048
08/26/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Substitution of Attorneys (SC)20-31546
08/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a substitution of counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove attorneys Mike Beede, James Fox, and The Law Office of Mike Beede, PLLC, from the docket and service list and shall add the law firm of Shumway Van and attorney Garrett R. Chase as counsel for appellant. (SC)20-32022
02/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Scott R. Lachman of Akerman LLP, as counsel for respondent Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC). (SC)21-03670
02/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Rex D. Garner is no longer associated with Akerman LLP). (SC)21-03671
04/21/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Authorities -- Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC's. (SC)21-11494
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13950
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16305
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16305