Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79395
Short Caption:NEWMAN VS. FULL COLOR GAMES, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79512
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A759862Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/20/2019 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/14/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-34132
08/14/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-34134
08/16/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Richard H. Newman. (SC)
08/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-34604
08/20/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (SC).19-34875
08/29/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Michael K. Wall of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC as counsel for Respondent). (SC)19-36259
09/16/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.19-38590
09/25/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-39979
09/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement). (SC)19-40002
09/26/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (File-Stamped Docketing Statement with Certificate of Service on Settlement Judge). (SC)19-40194
10/03/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)19-41076
10/07/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)19-41417
10/15/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. Nos. 79395/79512.19-42661
01/13/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/14/20). (SC)
01/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-01750
01/14/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-01812
01/14/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC)20-01894
01/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 21, 2020. (SC).20-02408
01/21/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/22/20). (SC)
01/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief and Appendix due: 5 days.20-02946
01/24/2020BriefFiled Appellants Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 01/27/20 NOTICE).
01/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. (SC).20-03590
01/27/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC).20-03593
01/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 1. (SC).20-03594
01/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 2. (SC).20-03595
02/20/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)20-07058
02/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 27, 2020. (SC)20-07074
03/17/2020MotionFiled Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Full Color Games, Inc., and for Extension of Time for Full Color Games, Inc. to Locate New Counsel. (SC)20-10426
03/22/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Non-Opposition to Motion to Withdraw and Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time. (SC).20-11050
03/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Full Color Games, Inc., and for Extension of Time for Full Color Games, Inc. to Locate New Counsel. (SC).20-12174
04/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove Mark A. Hutchison, Todd W. Prall, Michael K. Wall, and Hutchison & Steffen as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall have 90 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. The briefing schedule is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)20-15447
07/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jeffrey Hulet as counsel for the Respondent). (SC).20-26584
07/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall add Jeffrey Hulet of Hogan Hulet PLLC to this court's docket as counsel of record for respondent. The briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-27459
08/27/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-31606
08/27/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume I (R.I.). (SC)20-31608
09/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' reply brief due: October 12, 2020. (SC)20-35535
10/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-37433
10/13/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12366
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15026
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15026