Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79459
Short Caption:NICOLE VS. SETERUS, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788695Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/14/2021 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/14/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
08/23/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-35342
08/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)19-35344
09/10/2019Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/08/19. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. (SC).19-37870
09/10/2019Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).19-37872
09/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC)19-38761
09/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant, who is proceeding in forma pauperis, has filed a transcript request form. This court is unable to determine which transcripts, if any, are necessary for review on appeal, and therefore, declines to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. (SC)19-38762
09/17/2019Docketing StatementFiled Respondents Seterus, Inc.; Federal National Mortgage Association; and Selene Finance's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement Pursuant to NRAP 14(f). (SC)19-38853
09/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)19-39833
09/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 2. (SC)19-39834
09/30/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 3, 4 to 5 (SEALED). (SC)
10/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. The clerk of this court shall transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary and district court order to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Appellant or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. Briefing is suspended. (SC)19-42026
12/09/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jordan T. Smith, Esq., of the law firm Pisanelli Bice PLLC as pro bono attorney for Appellant). (SC)19-49801
12/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief due: 90 days. It appears from the documents before this court that Michael Saffelder, Alan Ong, First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC, and M&M Mortgage may not be proper respondents to this appeal; it appears they may not have been served with process and thus were not parties to the underlying action. ). It further appears that Selene Finance was named as a party in the amended complaint and made an appearance in the district court and thus should be added as a respondent. Accordingly, Mr. Smith shall have 14 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, who the proper respondents to this appeal are. Respondents Federal National Mortgage Association and Seterus, Inc shall have 7 days from the date of service of appellant's response to file and serve any reply. (SC).19-50989
12/31/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Response to Order Entered in this Court on December 17, 2019 due: January 14, 2020. (SC).19-52534
01/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Court's December 17, 2019 Order. (SC)20-01900
01/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-01987
01/14/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)20-01901
01/15/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Response to Court's December 17, 2019 Order). (SC)20-02018
01/15/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of No Service (Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested). (SC)20-02019
01/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Respondents. Counsel has filed a response indicating that Michael Saffelder, Alan Ong, First American Trustee Servicing Solution, LLC, and M&M Mortgage are not proper respondents to this appeal. Counsel also states that Selene Finance and Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 should be added as respondents. The clerk shall remove Michael Saffelder, Alan Ong, First American Trustee Servicing Solution, LLC, and M&M Mortgage as respondents to this appeal and add Selene Finance and Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 as respondents. (SC).20-03812
02/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation and Withdrawal of Counsel (Matthew S. Carter is no longer associated with Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP). (SC)20-07118
03/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Michael K. Wall of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC as counsel for Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016). (SC)20-10060
03/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-10255
03/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 15, 2020. (SC)20-10313
04/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC).20-13707
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 29, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-14270
05/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-20428
06/24/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Federal National Mortgage Association, Selene Finance, and Seterus, Inc. shall have until July 13, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-23371
06/24/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016's Answering Brief due: July 13, 2020. (SC)20-23474
07/13/2020BriefFiled Respondents Seterus, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association and Selene Finance's Answering Brief. (SC)20-25713
07/13/2020BriefFiled Respondent Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)20-25717
08/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC)20-29748
08/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 11, 2020. (SC)20-29837
09/11/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Guidance From the Court or, Alternatively, to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant Sylvia Nicole. (SC)20-33661
09/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents Seterus, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association and Selene Finance's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Guidance from the Court or, Alternatively, to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant Sylvia Nicole. (SC)20-34410
09/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Guidance From the Court; and Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request).20-34821
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant has filed a motion for guidance or to withdraw as counsel. Counsel has also filed a notice of withdrawal of the motion for guidance or to withdraw and a motion for a second extension of time to file the reply brief. No action will be taken on the motion for guidance or to withdraw. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have until October 22, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-35035
10/22/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-38827
10/23/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 14, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-06427
03/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-09275
04/14/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 79459. (NNP21-RP/LS/AS) (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "We affirm the district court's order dismissing appellant's complaint in part and reverse it to the extent that it dismissed the complaint with prejudice." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13898
05/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 15, 2021. (SC)21-15409
06/15/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-17234
06/15/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
06/28/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18515
07/12/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-19977
07/26/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC)21-21521
08/25/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-24748
08/25/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 26, 2021. (SC)21-24748