Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79487
Short Caption:UNITED AUTO. INS. CO. VS. NALDERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78085, 78243, 80965
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549111Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/30/2019 / Haire, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2019Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
08/28/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)19-35930
08/28/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-35932
08/28/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie. Check no. 195677. (SC)
08/30/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC).19-36436
09/19/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: October 2, 2019. (SC).19-39052
10/02/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-41002
10/23/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 7, 2019, at 9:00 am. (SC).19-43832
11/12/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-46281
11/13/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-46551
11/27/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)19-48486
02/11/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension To File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-05763
02/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 12, 2020. (SC)20-05792
03/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-09919
03/13/2020MotionFiled Respondent Gary Lewis' Objection to UAIC's Second Request for Motion to Extend Time to File an Opening Brief. (SC)20-10059
04/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 13, 2020. (SC).20-12752
04/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).20-13991
04/16/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Objection to UAIC's Third Extension of Time to File an Opening Brief. (SC).20-14564
04/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply Brief on Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-15773
04/29/2020OtherChief Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
05/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 13, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-16546
05/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Suggestion of Mootness. (SC)Y20-18310
05/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Exhibits to Suggestion of Mootness. (SC).20-18317
05/18/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Response to UAIC's Suggestion of Mootness. (SC).Y20-18895
05/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply Brief on Suggestion of Mootness. (SC)Y20-19902