Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79543
Short Caption:928 COUNTRY BACK TR. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A753184Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/05/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-37159
09/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-37163
09/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-37165
09/09/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ayon Law. Check no. 1392. (SC)
09/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-37640
09/13/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-38382
09/16/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:19-38466
09/30/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-40453
09/30/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/30/19 and 07/31/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/01/19). (SC)
10/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)19-40728
10/07/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/30/19 and 07/321/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC)19-41485
11/05/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:7/30/19 and 07/31/19. (SC)19-45490
11/06/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Rule 46 Substitution of Attorneys (Michael N. Beede and James W. Fox of the Law Office of Mike Beede, PLLC as counsel for appellant in place of Ayon Law, PLLC). (SC)19-45686
01/13/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 28, 2020. (SC).20-01496
01/27/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-03639
02/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 27, 2020. (SC).20-05550
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-07942
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-07943
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-07944
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 Part 1. (SC)20-07945
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 Part 4. (SC)20-07946
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 Part 1. (SC)20-07949
02/27/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)20-07950
02/27/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-07952
02/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jamie K. Combs of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondent). (SC)20-08032
03/30/2020MotionFiled Stipulation For Time Extension For Bank Of America, N.A.'S Answering Brief. (SC).20-12141
03/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 29, 2020. (SC).20-12289
04/28/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Motion). (SC).20-16117
05/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until May 6, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-16577
05/06/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).20-17173
06/05/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 19, 2020. (SC).20-21285
06/17/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Of Disassociation (Darren Brenner no longer represents the Respondent). (SC).20-22567
06/19/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-22968
06/22/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan). (SC)20-25444
09/18/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC)20-34446
09/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Petition for Rehearing due: October 20, 2020. (SC)20-35827
10/20/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-38481
10/20/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Ariel E. Stern. (SC)
11/24/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)20-42819
12/02/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent shall have until December 22, 2020, to file and serve the en banc reconsideration. (SC)20-43620
12/22/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)20-46252
01/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-00817
01/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Joseph Y. Hong as counsel for appellant). (SC)21-02118
01/25/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's answer to the petition for en banc reconsideration due: February 8, 2021. (SC)21-02213
02/08/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Response to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-03803
03/05/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. The petition for en banc reconsideration is granted and this matter shall stand submitted on the briefs and record previously filed. En Banc (SC)21-06428
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating Judgment and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC (SC)21-10279
05/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12704
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12704