Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79555
Short Caption:TRIANGULUM PARTNERS, LLC VS. GALAXY GAMING, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79924, 81936, 82828
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A794293Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/09/2019 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/13/2021 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/13/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from GTG LLP. Check no. 6742. (SC)
09/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-37441
09/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-37447
09/09/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.19-37587
09/24/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-39642
09/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement). (SC)19-39734
09/24/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement). (SC)19-39768
09/27/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Seal Portions of Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)19-40306
10/04/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 4, 2019. (SC)19-41206
10/14/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)19-42429
10/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We direct the clerk to file under seal the unredacted copies of appellant's answer and counterclaim, amended counterclaim, and any exhibits thereto. (SC)19-42677
10/15/2019Docketing StatementFiled - SEALED - Unredacted Portions of Docketing Statement (Answer and Counterclaim, Amended Counterclaim). (SC)
12/20/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)19-51578
12/20/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)19-51652
12/23/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Settlement Judge - Motion to Dismiss Appeal). (SC)19-51734
12/23/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: January 10, 2020. (SC).19-51810
01/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-01297
01/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Seal Appendix to Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-01299
01/10/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss (Redacted). (SC)20-01406
01/13/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-01634
01/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Erika Pike Turner). (SC)20-01906
01/17/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-02445
01/17/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-02537
01/22/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Corrected Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-03070
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent moves to dismiss this appeal. The motion is denied. fn1 [Appellant's motion to file an appendix in support of the response to the motion to dismiss under seal is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the appendix received on January 23, 2020, under seal.] (SC).20-05960
02/13/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal (Filed Under Seal). (SC).
03/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (Redacted). (SC)20-09373
03/09/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief Volume 1 of 7. (SC)20-09374
03/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Redact Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix Thereto. (SC)20-09375
03/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the unredacted opening brief and appendix volumes 3 through 7, received on March 11, 2020, under seal. (SC).20-10804
03/19/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SEALED). (SC).
03/19/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3-7 (SEALED). (SC).
04/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: May 4, 2020. (SC)20-14672
05/04/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-16869
05/04/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Redact Galaxy Gaming, Inc.'s Answering Brief. (SC)20-16870
05/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to submit an unredacted copy of the answering brief. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the unredacted copy under seal. Appellant shall have until June 3, 2020, to file and serve a reply brief if deemed necessary.20-18269
05/13/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (Unredacted Version) (SEALED). (SC)
06/03/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 17, 2020. (SC).20-20862
06/17/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).20-22633
06/17/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
12/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)20-44791
12/29/2020MotionFiled Respondent Galaxy Gaming, Inc.'s Request to Supplement the Record on Appeal and for Judicial Notice. (SC)20-46791
12/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-46915
01/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Galaxy Gaming, Inc.'s Request to Supplement the Record on Appeal and for Judicial Notice and Countermotion to Supplement the Record. (SC)21-00310
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure (Justice Kristina Pickering). This matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 13, 2021. On December 29, 2020, respondent Galaxy Gaming filed its "Request to Supplement the Record on Appeal and for Judicial Notice," to which appellant Triangulum Partners LLC responded on January 5, 2021, with its "Response and Counter-Motion to Supplement to Record." These papers and their exhibits reference proceedings before the Nevada Gaming Commission. Pursuant to Rule 2.11(C) of the Nevada Code of Judicial Conduct, please be advised that one of the members of the Nevada Gaming Commission , Rosa Solis-Rainey, is a law partner of my husband, Steve Morris, and a former law partner of mine. I have no bias for or against any part to this appeal. However, I make this disclosure so that any person who wishes to request my recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing and filed no later than Friday, January 8, 2021. (SC)21-00361
01/07/2021BriefFiled Reply Brief Galaxy Gaming, Inc.'s Reply to Request to Supplement the Record on Appeal and for Judicial Notice and Non-Opposition to Triangulum Partners, LLC's Countermotion to Supplement the Record. (SC)21-00495
01/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This court grants the motion and counter-motion to supplement to the extent the supplemental materials will be accepted as part of the record, but the court defers to resolution on the merits whether these materials will be considered in deciding this appeal. (SC)21-00982
01/13/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. 79555. (NNP21-EC/KP/DH) (SC)
03/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. (VACATED PER ORDER FILED 4/9/21). (SC)21-08678
04/07/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Correct Order of Affirmance. (SC)21-10062
04/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion asking this court to correct a misstatement in the order of affirmance. The motion is granted and the March 26, 2021, order of affirmance is hereby vacated. An amended order of affirmance will be filed immediately upon the filing of this order. (SC)21-10222
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Amended Order of Affirmance. "Without expressing any opinion on the merits of the parties' claims and counterclaims, we therefore affirm." NP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-10223
05/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12706
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12706