Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79569
Short Caption:PERFORMANCE STEEL, INC. VS. WALLNER TOOLING/EXPAC, INC. C/W 79993Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:79569*, 79993Related Case(s):73644, 73644-COA, 79993
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A661338Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:None for Justice SilverPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:09/12/2019 / Haire, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/10/2021 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/10/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/10/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-37767
09/10/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-37770
09/10/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James J. Pisanelli. (SC)
09/11/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-37990
09/12/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC)19-38222
10/02/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: October 16, 2019. (SC)19-40858
10/08/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 3, 2019. (SC)19-41650
10/16/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-42907
12/11/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).19-50150
12/12/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days single opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).19-50319
12/24/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/09/19. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)19-52030
03/11/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-09690
03/11/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-09691
03/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 10, 2020. (SC)20-09736
04/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-13458
04/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (Duplicate) Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-13459
04/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Limited Response to Performance Steel, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79569/79993 (SC)20-13743
04/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. Nos. 79569/79993 (SC)20-13745
04/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Limited Response to Performance Steel, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79569/79993 (Duplicate). (SC)20-13746
04/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. Nos. 79569/79993 (Duplicate). (SC)20-13747
04/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-13955
04/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request) (Duplicate). Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-13956
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellant shall have until May 11, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-14272
05/11/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-17861
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-17868
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17881
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17882
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17888
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17889
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17895
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17897
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17898
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17899
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17900
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17901
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17902
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17903
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17905
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17906
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17907
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11 of 19 - part 1. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17908
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11 of 19 - part 2. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17909
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 12 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17910
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17911
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17912
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17913
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 16 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17914
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 17 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17915
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 18 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17916
05/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 19 of 19. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17917
05/11/2020MotionFiled Motion to File Certain Pages of Volumes 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 of Appellant's Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17918
05/12/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service of Volumes 1-19 of Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC).20-17983
05/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to file certain pages of the appendix under seal. The motion is denied without prejudice because appellant has not provided this court with copies of the documents it wishes to file under seal. Appellant may file a renewed motion to seal within 7 days of the date of this order. Any renewed motion must be accompanied by copies of the documents appellant seeks to file under seal. These documents should be sent to this court via mail. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-18702
05/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Renewed Motion to File Certain Pages of Volumes 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 of Appellant's Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-19420
06/01/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-20618
06/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's unopposed motion for leave to file documents under seal is granted. The clerk shall file the portions of the appendix received on May 29, 2020, under seal. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-21071
06/04/2020AppendixFiled SEALED Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)
06/29/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Reply Brief. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-24080
06/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 31, 2020. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-24149
07/31/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Reply Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-27940
08/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 14, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-28418
08/14/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)20-30202
08/17/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)
10/14/2020OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
01/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 10, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-01041
02/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-05396
03/10/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. EC/KP/DH (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Ordef Reversing, Vacating, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED, VACATE the district court's award of attorney fees and costs, AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-16918
06/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-18705
06/29/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Nikki L. Baker. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 14 days. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-19821
07/21/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: August 6, 2021. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-21010
08/06/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-22972
08/23/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)21-24416
09/07/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 79569/79993. (SC)Y21-25936
09/08/2021OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal