Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76295-COA
Short Caption:CITY OF HENDERSON VS. SPANGLERCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):76295
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A759871Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/28/2020 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:William S. Boyd School of Law - UNLV
Submission Date:01/28/2020How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
12/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this appeal. Accordingly, the appeal will be scheduled for oral argument on January 28, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. at the Thomas and Mack Moot Court Facility on the campus of the William S. Boyd School of Law in Las Vegas. (COA).19-50169
01/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice: Oral argument for this case has been scheduled for January 28, 2020 at 10:30 am for 30 minutes at William S. Boyd School of Law - UNLV /Moot Courtroom. (mh)20-01530
01/28/2020MotionFiled Max Michor of the Las Vegas Review Journal Requesting Access to Photograph Oral Arguments in Docket Nos. 76295-COA and 76781-COA. (COA)20-03783
01/28/2020MotionFiled Alexander Falconi of Our Nevada Judges Requesting Cameras in the Courtroom in Docket Nos. 76295-COA and 76781-COA. (COA)20-03785
01/28/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. (COA)
01/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. A request having been made by Las Vegas Review-Journal seeking access to the Nevada Court of Appeals oral arguments for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearings to be held January 28, 2020, beginning at 10:30 a.m. and 11:00 a.m., in the above-entitled matters; I is hereby ordered that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. Max Michor of Las Vegas Review-Journal is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. Nos. 76295/76871. (COA).20-03925
01/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. A request having been made by Our Nevada Judges seeking access to the Nevada Court of Appeals oral arguments for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearings to be held January 28, 2020, beginning at 10:30 a.m. and 11:00 a.m., in the above-entitled matters; I is hereby ordered that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. Max Michor of Las Vegas Review-Journal is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. Nos. 76295/76871. (COA).20-03928
05/14/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Tao, J. Majority:Tao/Gibbons/Bulla. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. (COA)20-18325