Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77847-COA
Short Caption:IN RE: MERBACHCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):77847
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1800736Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred from Supreme Court
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
01/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Bankruptcy Filing. (COA).20-00430
02/11/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed without prejudice to Merbach's right to move for its reinstatement within 60 days of either the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, if such a motion is deemed appropriate at that time." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB.20-05692
03/09/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
03/09/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
05/20/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).