Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79631
Short Caption:YU VS. YUCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70348, 70348-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D478791Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ruorong Yu. Check no. 338. (SC)
09/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-38887
09/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)19-38890
09/19/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-39049
09/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC)
09/26/2019OtherReturned Unfiled Document - "Proper Person Appellants Informal Brief." (SC)19-40095
10/02/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (David Ortiz as counsel for appellant). (SC)19-41004
10/04/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/217/19. To Court Reporter: Dept. R., Family Division (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/07/19). (SC)
10/07/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. (SC)19-41434
10/07/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: October 23, 2019. (SC)19-41424
10/08/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Respondent's Response to Appellant's Informal Brief (with attachments). (SC) (STRICKEN PER 10/16/19 ORDER).
10/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Transcript Request Form, Docketing Statement and to inform this court, in writing, whether appellant would like to proceed on the informal opening brief filed on September 19, 2019, or whether counsel intends to file a supplemental opening brief and appendix due: October 23, 2019. The pro se response to appellant's informal brief, filed on October 8, 2019, shall be stricken. (SC).19-42936
10/23/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/27/19.To Court Reporter: Department R. (SC)19-43920
10/23/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-43934
10/29/2019OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Appellant's Request Extension of Service Hours. (SC)19-44500
11/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether he intends to proceed on the informal brief filed September 19, 2019, or whether he wishes to file a supplemental opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-47291
11/22/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Notice of Intent to File a Supplemental Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-48007
11/22/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule and Appeal. (SC)19-48008
01/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC).20-00323
03/03/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Opening Brief). (SC)20-08583
03/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Appellant's Attorney Withdrawal and Applies for an Extension. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 3/10/20).
03/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until April 2, 2020, to file and serve the supplemental opening brief and appendix. If counsel for appellant wishes to withdraw or if appellant wishes to substitute a different attorney for her current counsel, counsel shall file an appropriate document. Appellant remains represented by attorney David Ortiz at this time. As such, the clerk of this court shall strike the document filed by appellant in pro se on March 9, 2020. (SC)20-09413
04/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Opening Brief). (SC)20-12709
04/07/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief and Withdraw Attorney David Ortiz. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/15/20). (SC)
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant remains represented by attorney David Ortiz. Appellant shall have until May 4, 2020, to file and serve a supplemental opening brief and appendix. If no supplemental brief is filed, this appeal shall proceed on the pro se informal opening brief filed September 19, 2019. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, the clerk shall strike the pro se document filed on April 7, 2020. (SC)20-14342
05/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Opening Brief). (SC). (STRICKEN PER 05/12/20 ORDER).
05/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant is represented by attorney David Ortiz in this appeal. Appellant has now filed a document in pro se purporting to substitute attorney Fred Page as counsel in place of Mr. Ortiz. However, the document does not comply with NRAP 46(e)(2) as it is not signed by either Mr. Page or Mr. Ortiz. Because appellant remains represented by Mr. Ortiz, the clerk shall strike the pro se document filed on May 7, 2020. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-18064