Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79684
Short Caption:AYCOCK (DEVONTAY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C337018Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
09/26/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-40050
10/10/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cynthia Georgilas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/10/19, 01/17/19, 03/12/19, 03/14/19, 03/15/19, 03/21/19, 04/04/19, 06/11/19, 06/13/19. (SC)19-42028
10/17/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-43173
10/24/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/18/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19, 06/24/19, 06/25/19, 06/26/19, 06/27/19, 08/14/19. (SC)19-44162
12/24/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC).19-52018
01/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 7, 2020. (SC).20-01572
02/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-05427
02/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 9, 2020. (SC).20-06981
03/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Third Motion To Extend Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC)20-09341
03/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 9, 2020. (SC).20-10802
04/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-13626
04/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 11, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-15456
05/11/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extenxion of Time. (SC)20-17919
05/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 10, 2020. (SC).20-19296
06/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC).20-23669
07/09/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-25442
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 20, 2020. (SC).20-26139
07/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Exhibit. (SC)20-26511
07/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-26534
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief V 1. (SC)20-26535
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief V 2. (SC)20-26536
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief V 3. (SC)20-26540
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief V 4. (SC)20-26537
07/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief V 5. (SC)20-26539
07/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. Appellant's motion to transmit a CD of surveillance video that was played for the jury and entered at trial as Exhibit 1 is granted. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court Exhibit 1. (SC)20-27560
08/07/2020ExhibitFiled *** ORIGINAL Exhibit - State's Exhibit 1 (CD of surveillance video that was played for the jury and entered at trial.) (SC)
08/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance. (John Niman) (SC)20-30679
08/20/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-30680
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief Due: September 21, 2020. (SC)20-31256
09/18/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-34477
10/20/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-38328
11/17/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16894
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19183
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19183