Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79689
Short Caption:VENETIAN CASINO RESORT, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (SEKERA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79689-COA, 80450, 80816, 80816-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A772761Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Writ Issued
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Michael A. Royal. (SC)
09/26/2019Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition Under NRAP Rules 21(a)(6) and 27(e). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 9/27/19)19-40111
09/26/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 9/27/19)19-40113
09/26/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 9/27/19)19-40114
09/26/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC) TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 9/27/19)19-40115
09/26/2019MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8 Staying Execution of Order Directing Petitioners to Disclose Private, Protected Information of Guests Not Involved in Underlying Lawsuit (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH MICHAEL A. ROYAL). (SC)
09/26/2019MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8 Staying Execution of Order Directing Petitioners to Disclose Private, Protected Information of Guests Not Involved in Underlying Lawsuit. Relief needed by October 2, 2019. (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS ON 9/27/19)19-40190
09/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-40382
09/27/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Appointment. The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge, being disqualified in the above-entitled matter pending in the court of appeals, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter pending in the court of appeals in place of Judge Bulla. (SC)20-06100
05/14/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Fn1[The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. In her place the Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Senior Justice, was appointed to participate in the decision of this matter under order of assignment entered on February 13, 2020. Subsequently, the order was withdrawn.] Before: Gibbons/Tao. Author: Gibbons, C.J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 103. (SC)
06/24/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Party in Interest's Petition for Review due: July 21, 2020. (SC)20-23392