Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79699
Short Caption:RIVES, M.D. VS. CENTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A731390Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:09/30/2019 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/10/2021 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:02/10/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2019Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
09/27/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-40324
09/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-40326
09/30/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nationwide Legal Nevada. Check no. 211831. (SC)
09/30/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC).19-40646
10/07/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)19-41371
10/08/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-41678
10/30/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 19, 2019, at 2:00 pm. (SC).19-44635
12/05/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-49413
12/06/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-49530
12/17/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(1)(C). (SC)19-51013
03/04/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time for Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-08652
03/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 6, 2020. (SC)20-08661
04/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time for Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)20-12827
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 6, 2020. (SC).20-13664
05/06/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC).20-17143
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 1 Part 1. (SC).20-17147
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 1 Part 2. (SC).20-17149
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 2. (SC).20-17155
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 3. (SC).20-17157
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 4 Part 1. (SC).20-17158
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 4 Part 2. (SC).20-17161
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 4 Part 3. (SC).20-17162
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 5. (SC).20-17169
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 6 Part 1. (SC).20-17171
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 6 Part 2. (SC).20-17172
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 7 Part 1. (SC).20-17177
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 7 Part 2. (SC).20-17179
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 8. Part 1 (SC).20-17194
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 8 Part 2. (SC).20-17197
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 8 Part 3. (SC).20-17199
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 8 Part 4. (SC).20-17200
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 9 Part 1-4 (SC)20-17209
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 9 Part 5-9. (SC)20-17210
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 10 Part 1-4. (SC)20-17213
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 10 Part 5. (SC)20-17214
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 11 Part 1-4. (SC)20-17217
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 11 Part 5-8. (SC)20-17218
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 11 Part 9. (SC)20-17219
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 12 Part 1-4. (SC)20-17222
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 12 Part 5-8. (SC)20-17223
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 13 Part 1-4. (SC)20-17224
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 13 Part 5-7. (SC)20-17225
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 14 Part 1-4. (SC)20-17226
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 14 - Part 5-8. (SC)20-17227
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 14 - Part 9-12. (SC)20-17228
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 14 - Part 13-16. (SC)20-17230
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 15 Part 1-4. (SC)20-17233
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 15 - Part 5-6. (SC)20-17234
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 16. (SC)20-17236
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 17. (SC)20-17238
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 18. (SC)20-17239
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 19. (SC)20-17240
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 20. (SC)20-17241
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 21. (SC)20-17242
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 22. (SC)20-17243
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 23. (SC)20-17244
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 24. (SC)20-17245
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 25. (SC)20-17246
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 26. (SC)20-17247
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 27. (SC)20-17248
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 28. (SC)20-17249
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 29. (SC)20-17250
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 30. (SC)20-17251
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 31. (SC)20-17252
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 32. (SC)20-17253
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 33. (SC)20-17254
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 34. (SC)20-17258
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 35. (SC)20-17259
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 36. (SC)20-17260
05/14/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to File Amended Volumes of Appendix. (SC).20-18438
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 1, Part 1. (SC).20-18442
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 1, Part 2. (SC).20-18444
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 4, Part 1. (SC).20-18450
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 4, Part 2. (SC).20-18458
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 4, Part 3. (SC).20-18459
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 7, Part 1. (SC).20-18460
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 7, Part 2. (SC).20-18461
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 10, Part 1. (SC).20-18463
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 10, Part 2. (SC).20-18464
05/18/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Second Motion to File Amended Volume of Appendix. (SC)20-18912
05/18/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Second Motion to File Amended Volume of Appendix. (SC)20-18913
05/18/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Amended Volume 19. (SC)20-18914
05/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellants' motions for leave to file amended volumes of the appendix are granted. The amended volumes were filed on May 14 and 18, 2020. (SC).20-19623
06/05/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC). (STRICKEN PER 07/16/20 ORDER).
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix Vols 1-4. (SC). (STRICKEN PER 07/16/20 ORDER).
06/05/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix Vol 5. (SC). (STRICKEN PER 07/16/20 ORDER).
06/12/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to strike documents from respondents' appendix and portions of answering brief relying on the documents. (SC).20-22139
06/16/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to File Revised Volume 1 to Respondents' Appendix. (SC)20-22504
06/16/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Revised Appendix Volume 1. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 07/16/20 ORDER).
06/16/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Response To Appellants' Motion To Strike Documents From Respondents' Appendix And Portions Of Answering Brief Relying On The Documents. (SC)20-22507
06/23/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Reply in support of Rives motion to strike. (SC).20-23294
07/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time for Reply Brief (First Request). (SC)20-24655
07/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Reply Brief due: August 5, 2020. (SC)20-24730
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Strike. Appellants have filed a motion to strike certain documents from respondents' appendix and the portions of the answering brief that rely on those documents. The clerk shall strike the answering brief and appendix filed on June 5, 2020. Amended Answering Brief and Appendix due: 21 days. fn1 [Respondents' motion for leave to file a revised volume one of respondents' appendix is denied. The clerk shall strike the revised appendix filed on June 16, 2020.] (SC).20-26138
07/22/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (Amended). (SC)20-26739
07/22/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1, Part 1. (SC)20-26759
07/27/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix Volume 2 - Cited Trial Exhibit Excerpts Only. (SC)20-27236
07/28/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-27510
07/29/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on February 10, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC).21-00282
01/15/2021BriefFiled Appellants' Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Oral Argument: February 10, 2021). (SC)21-01393
01/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Response to Appellants' Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-01594
01/27/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-02505
02/10/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel RP/LS/AS. (SC).
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12119
05/17/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-14116
05/17/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid on rehearing. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert L. Eisenberg. (SC)
05/28/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-15411
06/08/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-16359
06/22/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC)21-17883
07/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20658
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20658