Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79700
Short Caption:VEGAS VALLEY GROWERS, LLC VS. MED. MAN TECH., INC. C/W 80989Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:79700*, 80989Related Case(s):80989
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A777319Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2019 / Chapin, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/23/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2019Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
09/27/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-40337
09/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-40341
09/27/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nevada Law Foundation Trust Accounts. Check no. 1437. (SC)
09/30/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick N. Chapin. (SC).19-40658
10/16/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 3, 2019. (SC)19-42842
10/18/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)19-43334
12/04/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-49115
12/05/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-49353
12/19/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/03/19, 06/12/19, 07/02/19, 07/12/19, 07/30/19, 07/31/19, 08/01/19, 08/02/19, 08/05/19, 08/06/19, 09/18/19, 10/21/19, 11/13/19. To Court Reporter: Brittany Amoroso. (SC)19-51390
01/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Brittany Amoroso stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 06/03/19, 06/12/19, 07/02/19, 07/12/19, 07/30/19, 07/31/19, 08/01/19, 08/02/19, 08/05/19, 08/06/19, 09/18/19, 10/21/19, and 11/13/19. (SC)20-02284
02/18/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 18, 2020. (SC).20-06384
03/12/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC)20-09876
03/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 15, 2020. (SC).20-10216
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)20-14374
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2 Part A. (SC)20-14420
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC)20-14422
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC)20-14424
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC)20-14425
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC)20-14427
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC)20-14428
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC)20-14429
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC)20-14431
04/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC)20-14432
04/15/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-14441
04/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance. Kathleen A. Wilde for Respondent. (SC)20-15637
05/15/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)20-18656
05/15/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike Improper Documents from Appellant's Appendix and Appellant's Improper Citations to Matters Outside the Record. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)20-18669
05/15/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Stay Briefing, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)20-18723
05/19/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until June 5, 2020, to file and serve responses to the motion to strike and motion to stay briefing, or in the alternative, motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. (SC)20-19067
06/05/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike. (SC)20-21316
06/05/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response and Non-Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Stay Briefing, or, In the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time. (SC)20-21318
06/11/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent shall have until June 26, 2020, to file and serve a reply to response to motion to strike and motion to stay briefing, or in the alternative, motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. (SC).20-21902
06/26/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply In Support of Motion to Strike Improper Documents from Appellant's Appendix and Appellant's Improper Citations to Matters Outside the Record. (SC)20-23873
08/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Denying Motion to Strike. Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Raffi A. Nahabedian. Check no. 1153. The motion to strike is denied. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental appendix. Appellant shall, within the same time period, file an errata to the opening brief. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 80989. Respondent shall thereafter have 30 days from service of the opening brief in Docket No. 80989 to file and serve a single answering brief addressing the briefs filed in both docket numbers. Appellant shall then have 30 days to file and serve a single reply brief, if deemed necessary. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)20-31712
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix to Opening Brief Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)20-35510
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Amended Supplemental Appendix to Opening Brief Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)20-35556
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 1 (SC)20-35627
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 2 (SC)20-35626
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 3 (SC)20-35629
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 4 (SC)20-35631
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 5 (SC)20-35632
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 6 (SC)20-35637
09/28/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 Vol. 7 (SC)20-35638
09/28/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Brief Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief in (79700) Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)20-35650
09/28/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (80989) Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)20-35651
10/27/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file the Answering Brief. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)20-39255
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 4, 2021. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC).20-40696
01/05/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/5/21) Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)
01/05/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (REJECT PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 1/5/21) Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)
01/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Documents. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-00185
01/05/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time Unopposed to File Answering Brief and Appendix Due to Technical Difficulties. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-00296
01/05/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-00297
01/05/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-00301
01/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief and appendix was filed on January 5, 2021. Appellant's reply brief due: February 4, 2021. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-00654
01/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: February 18, 2021. (SC)21-02708
02/16/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (Second Request )(REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/17/21). Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)
02/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance for Appellant. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-04623
02/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (Second Request) Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)21-04742
02/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 4, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)21-05196
03/04/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Excess Pages to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation for Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-06418
03/04/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-06420
03/11/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation for Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-07091
03/12/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation for Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 79700/80989 (SC)21-07283
03/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant filed a motion to exceed the type-volume limitation in the reply brief. Respondent has filed an opposition to the motion, and appellant has filed a reply. Having considered these filings, the motion is granted. The reply brief was filed on March 4, 2021. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)21-08015
03/19/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)
07/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)21-21274
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court to properly compute post-judgment interest consistent with this order." SNP21-RP/LS/AS Nos. 80989/79700. (SC)21-21276
08/05/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: August 24, 2021. Nos. 80989/79700. (SC)21-22768
08/24/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)Y21-24719
08/24/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert R. Warns, III. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)
09/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's answer due: 14 days. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)21-25893
09/21/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answer to the petition for rehearing due: October 5, 2021. Nos. 79700/80989. (SC)21-27219