Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78346-COA
Short Caption:GOODING (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78346
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A784790Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court
01/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record due: 40 days. (COA).20-01283
02/10/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (C329421). (COA)20-05450
02/11/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/20/18. (COA).20-05678
02/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/20/18. (COA).20-07214
02/25/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/26/19. (COA).20-07581
03/19/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB.20-10703
04/13/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
04/13/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)