Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 79719 & 79719-COA
Short Caption:WATKINS (KEENAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court & Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79719-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C308582Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
10/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-40803
10/08/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court's Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. (SC).19-41558
11/01/2019Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of District Court Minute Order filed in district court on October 29, 2019 appointing Public Defender as counsel for appellant. (SC)19-44898
11/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. The clerk of this court shall add the Clark County Public Defender's Office as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC).19-46289
12/03/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/07/15, 08/11/15, 01/14/16, 01/26/16, 02/11/16, 03/22/16, 07/26/16, 11/01/16, 03/07/17, 08/01/17, 01/23/18, 08/21/18, 10/30/18, 01/08/19, 01/15/19, 01/17/19, 05/14/19, 05/20/19, 05/21/19, 05/22/19, 05/23/19, 05/24/19, 07/11/19, 07/30/19 and 08/27/19. To Court Reporter: Gina Villani, Kristine Santi and Angie Calvillo. (SC)19-49058
12/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-49060
12/27/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/07/15. (SC)19-52258
12/30/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/11/15, 01/14/16, 01/26/16, 02/11/16, 03/22/16, 07/26/16, 11/01/16, 03/07/17, 08/01/17, 01/23/18, 08/21/18, 10/30/18, 01/08/19, 01/15/19, 01/17/19 and 05/14/19. (SC)19-52412
01/23/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/20/19, 05/21/19, 05/22/19, 05/23/19, 05/24/19, 07/11/19, 0730/19 and 08/27/19. (SC)20-03312
02/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Substitution of Attorney. (SC)20-07646
03/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel. The clerk shall substitute attorney T. Augustus Claus of Legal Resource Group as counsel of record for appellant in place of Alexander B. Bassett of the Clark County Public Defender's Office. (SC).20-08340
03/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-09873
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC).20-11646
06/26/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-23860
07/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-25205
09/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-35218
10/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. the motion is denied. Appellant has filed a motion for a third 90-day extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is denied. Appellant shall have until October 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-36038
10/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-39629
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 7 days. (SC)20-40693
11/19/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-42364
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)20-42368
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)20-42376
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)20-42380
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)20-42382
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC)20-42386
11/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC)20-42388
12/17/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jonathan E. VanBoskerck, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC)20-45642
12/17/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-45643
12/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 20, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-45836
01/20/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-01643
02/23/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-05347
02/23/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-08002
03/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
03/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-14966
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17673
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 22, 2021. (SC)21-17673