Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79729
Short Caption:ALLISON VS. DIGNITY HEALTHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A747551Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/22/2019 / Chapin, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
10/02/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-40954
10/02/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-40956
10/17/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bighorn Law LLC. Check no. 1708. (SC)
10/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-43223
10/22/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick N. Chapin. (SC).19-43607
11/12/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/13/19). (SC)19-46410
11/13/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-46539
11/25/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Tuesday, March 24, 2020. (SC).19-48073
11/27/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to File Docketing Statement. Due: 10 days. (SC)19-48454
12/02/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-48656
03/17/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 4, 2020, at 10:00 AM. (SC)20-10382
03/31/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by May 20, 2020. (SC).20-12221
04/28/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 8, 2020, at 10:00 AM. (SC)20-16049
05/07/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to July 20, 2020. (SC)20-17271
07/08/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-25183
07/13/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-25712
07/27/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/16/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/28/20). (SC)
07/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-27463
07/31/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/16/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-28081
10/12/2020MotionFiled Stipulation (Opening Brief). (SC)20-37410
10/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The parties' stipulation extending the time for the filing of the opening brief for 44 days is treated and granted as a joint motion for an extension of time. See NRAP 31(b)(2) (parties may stipulate to one 30-day extension of time from due date established by NRAP 31(a)(1)). Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 25, 2020. (SC)20-38140
11/25/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-43119
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume I. (SC)20-43124
12/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation (Answering Brief). (SC)20-45606
12/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: January 27, 2021. (SC)20-45625
01/27/2021BriefFiled Respondents Dignity Health and Dignity Health Medical Group Nevada LLC's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/28/21). (SC)
01/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief and Appendix. Corrected brief and appendix due: 5 days. (SC)21-02615
01/28/2021BriefFiled Respondents Dignity Health and Dignity Health Medical Group Nevada LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02619
01/28/2021AppendixFiled Respondents Dignity Health and Dignity Health Medical Group Nevada LLC's Appendix Volume I-3 to Answering Brief. (SC)21-02622
02/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents Dignity Health D/B/A St. Rose Dominican Hospital-Siena and Dignity Health Medical Group Nevada LLC's Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Branden D. Jung formerly of Lewis Bribois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, is hereby disassociated with the above-named matter). (SC)21-03533
03/29/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19797
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22470
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-22470