Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79749
Short Caption:THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. NEV. SANDCASTLES, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74522, 79749-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A691523Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2019Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
10/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-41221
10/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-41223
10/07/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: (SC)19-41382
10/07/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001647. (SC)
10/28/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-44364
11/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC).19-45750
12/09/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)19-49883
12/12/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)19-50405
01/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC).20-00604
03/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-09833
03/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Notice of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 03/19/20 NOTICE). (SC).
03/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Transcript Request). (SC).20-10727
03/19/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/09/19, 07/11/19, 07/15/19. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. (SC).20-10787
04/06/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-12948
04/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 6, 2020. (SC).20-12977
05/06/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-17192
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1. (SC).20-17195
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2. (SC).20-17196
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3. (SC).20-17203
05/06/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 4. (SC).20-17207
06/02/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering due: June 19, 2020. (SC)20-20675
06/19/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Nevada Sandcastle's, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC).20-22936
06/29/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).20-23953
06/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent previously received a telephonic extension of time to file the answering brief. Accordingly, a stipulation for an additional extension of time is not permitted. In this instance only, the stipulation is approved. The answering brief was filed on June 29, 2020. Appellant shall have until July 29, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)20-24157
07/24/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria L. Garibay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed. (SC)20-27082
07/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-27634
07/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-27635
07/29/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
08/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Nicholas E. Belay as counsel for Appellant). (SC)20-30174
09/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-32619
09/03/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
12/28/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
01/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/13/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Review due: January 29, 2021. (SC)21-01131
01/28/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition For Review (First Motion). (SC)21-02742
02/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until February 12, 2021, to file and serve any petition for review. If no petition for review is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)21-03327
02/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. (SC)21-04259
02/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve either a motion or stipulation to dismiss this matter or a petition for review. If no timely motion or stipulation to dismiss this matter or petition for review is filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC)21-04648
03/18/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal. (SC)21-07843
04/02/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. The parties have filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. The stipulation is approved and this appeal is dismissed. The clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith. fn1[The Court of Appeals entered an Order of Affirmance in this matter on December 28, 2020.] (SC)21-09540
04/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-09545
04/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
04/19/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk April 5, 2021. (SC)21-09545