Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79780
Short Caption:LEONARD (WILLIAM) VS. WARDEN (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60337
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 88CR004611BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/21/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/10/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
10/10/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-41978
10/24/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request Under NRAP 9(a)(1)(C). (SC)19-44108
10/31/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-44818
02/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-05200
02/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 23, 2020. (SC).20-06545
03/23/2020BriefFiled Brief Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-11232
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 of 22. (SC)20-11233
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 of 22. (SC)20-11234
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3 of 22. (SC)20-11235
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4 of 22. (SC)20-11236
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5 of 22. (SC)20-11237
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6 of 22. (SC)20-11238
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7 of 22. (SC)20-11239
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8 of 22. (SC)20-11240
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9 of 22. (SC)20-11241
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10 of 22. (SC)20-11242
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11 of 22. (SC)20-11243
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12 of 22. (SC)20-11244
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13 of 22. (SC)20-11245
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14 of 22. (SC)20-11246
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15 of 22. (SC)20-11247
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16 of 22. (SC)20-11248
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 17 of 22. (SC)20-11249
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 18 of 22. (SC)20-11250
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 19 of 22. (SC)20-11251
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 20 of 22. (SC)20-11252
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 21 of 22. (SC)20-11253
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 22 of 22. (SC)20-11254
03/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Charles Finlayson for Respondents). (SC)20-11297
05/06/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-17136
05/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Brief due: June 22, 2020. (SC).20-19292
06/19/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-22879
07/20/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-26484
07/21/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)21-10278
05/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12707
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12707