Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 79807
Short Caption:POPE INVS., LLC VS. CHINA YIDA HOLDING, CO. C/W 80709Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:79807*, 80709Related Case(s):80709
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A746732Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/17/2019 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2019Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
10/15/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-42598
10/15/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-42600
10/15/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Boies Schiller Flexner. Check no. 4112. (SC)
10/17/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley.19-43064
11/04/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-45307
11/15/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. SJ has spoken to both sides, but seeking further input for ECA. Estimate up to another ten to twenty days needed. (SC).19-46994
12/16/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-50850
12/17/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-50967
12/30/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/18/19. To Court Reporter: Brynn White (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/30/19). (SC)
12/30/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)19-52369
12/30/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/18/19. To Court Reporter: Brynn White. (SC)19-52393
02/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Brynn White stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/18/19. (SC)20-05011
03/09/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-09305
03/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief due: April 15, 2020. (SC)20-09460
03/27/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Extend Briefing Schedule for Case No. 79807. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC).20-11877
03/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Extend Briefing Schedule for Case No. 79807. (SC).20-12143
04/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Extend Briefing Schedule for Case No. 79807. (SC)20-12820
04/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate. These appeals are hereby consolidated. Appellants shall have until July 1, 2020, to file and serve an appendix and a single opening brief addressing all issues in these appeals. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC).20-12901
04/27/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Brynn White stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/09/19. (SC)20-15908
06/17/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC).20-22639
06/24/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). Nos. 79807/80709.(SC)20-23479
06/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-23516
07/10/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-25499
07/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC).20-25881
07/14/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Reply In Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC).20-25898
07/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 3, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-27941
07/31/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fifth Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-28069
08/04/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Sixth Request). No. 79807/80709. (SC)20-28427
08/11/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29654
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29657
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29658
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29659
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IV. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29660
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume V - Part 1. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29661
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VI - Part 1. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29662
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VII. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29663
08/11/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VIII. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-29664
08/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Appellants' motions for fifth and sixth extensions of time to file the opening brief are granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on August 11, 2020. Respondent shall have until September 10, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-30104
09/09/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-33272
09/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 26, 2020. Nos.79807/80709. (SC)20-33748
10/23/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-38991
10/28/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-39451
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: November 25, 2020. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-40700
11/25/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-43025
12/04/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/4/20). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)
12/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellants' Response to Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-44011
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 9, 2020. Nos. 79807/80709 (SC)20-44271
12/09/2020BriefFiled China Yida Holding, Co.'s Answering Brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-44857
12/18/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-45842
12/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Reply Brief due: January 29, 2021. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)20-45885
01/21/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-01810
01/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until February 5, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-02422
02/05/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Third Request). Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-03528
02/10/2021BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-04070
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on February 5, 2021, is granted. The reply brief was filed on February 10, 2021. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-04335
02/12/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-13889
07/08/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. Nos. 79807/80709. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-19570
08/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22261
08/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 3, 2021. Nos. 79807/80709. (SC)21-22261