Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79815
Short Caption:KECK (WILLIAM) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61117, 61675
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249447Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Stayed
Replacement:None for Justice HerndonPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/04/2021 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:01/04/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/17/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived - Criminal. (SC).
10/17/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC).19-43003
10/22/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)19-43594
10/28/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-44318
10/30/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 10/21/19. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction). (SC)19-44577
02/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-06203
02/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 14, 2020. (SC).20-07858
04/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Under Seal. (SC).20-13228
04/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-13294
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC).20-13296
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC).20-13297
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC).20-13298
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC).20-13299
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC).20-13300
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC).20-13301
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. (SC).20-13302
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. (SC).20-13303
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9. (SC).20-13304
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10. (SC).20-13306
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11. (SC).20-13307
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12. (SC).20-13308
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13. (SC).20-13309
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14. (SC).20-13310
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15. (SC).20-13313
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16. (SC).20-13314
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 17. (SC).20-13316
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 18. (SC).20-13320
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 19. (SC).20-13322
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 20. (SC).20-13324
04/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 21. (SC).20-13325
04/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the portions of appellant's appendix received on April 14, 2020. (SC)20-15470
04/23/2020AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix (SEALED). (SC).
05/08/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-17474
05/08/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-17475
05/08/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion Requesting Transmittal of Exhibits Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC)20-17476
05/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court State's Exhibit 221. (SC)20-19018
06/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-21327
06/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 8, 2020. (SC)20-22773
07/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-25207
07/08/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
12/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 4, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 10 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)20-43872
12/14/2020OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
12/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-46140
01/04/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 79815. (SC)
01/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Second Supplemental Appendix. (SC)21-00194
01/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed supplemental appendix, attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and shall file it separately. (SC)21-01976
01/22/2021AppendixFiled Second Supplemental Appendix. (SC)21-01977
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[Justice Douglas Herndon voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC (SC)21-10277
04/27/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-11987
05/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 27, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition is timely filed, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. (SC)21-12532
05/26/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-15127
06/04/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]21-16115
06/11/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay Remittitur. (SC)21-16857
06/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur. Appellant has now filed a motion to stay issuance of the remittitur pending consideration of filing a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court. The motion is granted. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until October 27, 2021. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by October 27, 2021, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by October 27, 2021, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)21-17438