Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 79817
Short Caption:MOORE (MAURICE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C324535Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/08/2020 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/08/2020How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/17/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived - Criminal. (SC).
10/17/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC).19-43025
10/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC).19-43027
10/17/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/31/19, 08/05/19, 08/06/19, 08/07/19, 08/08/19, 08/09/19, 08/12/19, 08/27/19 and 10/08/19. To Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/18/19). (SC)
10/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)19-43203
10/18/2019Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/31/19, 08/05/19, 08/06/19, 08/07/19, 08/08/19, 08/09/19, 08/12/19, 08/27/19 and 10/08/19. To Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo. (SC)19-43251
10/21/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC)
10/31/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-44836
12/09/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/31/19, 08/05/19, 08/06/19, 08/07/19, 08/08/19, 08/09/19, 08/12/19, 08/27/19 and 10/08/19. (SC).19-49717
02/13/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-06112
02/13/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix 1. (SC)20-06115
03/03/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Redact Minor Victim's Last Name from Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-08528
03/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Redact Minor Victim's Last Name from Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-08680
03/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed an unopposed motion to redact the minor victim's last name from the opening brief. The motion is granted. The clerk shall replace page three of the opening brief with the attached redacted page three. (SC)20-09128
03/16/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request) (Answering Brief). (SC)20-10089
03/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 15, 2020. (SC)20-10140
04/13/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-13860
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-13866
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-13868
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-13870
05/13/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).20-18320
05/14/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
07/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This appeal is scheduled for oral argument on September 8, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)20-27798
08/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)20-31282
09/08/2020Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 79817. (SC)
10/29/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC, Author: Gibbons, J., Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich//Cadish/Silver. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 71. (SC)20-39618
11/23/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-42592
11/23/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/18/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 1, 2020. (SC)20-42592