Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79832
Short Caption:HARTMAN VS. PALMS PLACE, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63718, 63718-COA, 66235, 81351
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A677846Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/24/2019 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2021How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Due. (SC)
10/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-43357
10/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-43359
10/23/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Kenneth N. Caldwell
10/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-43889
10/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)19-43999
10/24/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC).19-44098
11/15/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 12, 2019, at 10:00 am. (SC).19-47004
11/20/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Docketing Statement Out of Time; Motion for Clarification of the Names of All Respondents. (SC)19-47609
11/21/2019MotionFiled Assignees of Respondents Ken Logan And Quentin Kearney's Response to Motion to Enlarge Time to File Docketing Statement; Motion for Clarification of the Names of Respondents. (SC)19-47717
12/16/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-50855
12/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement and Clarification of Caption. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. Additionally, we direct the clerk of this court to amend the docket of this appeal to conform to the caption of this order. (SC)19-52175
12/26/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-52176
01/05/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-00470
01/07/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's - Assignees' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/07/2020). (SC)
01/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondent's - Assignees' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-00883
01/07/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Assignees' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-00887
01/07/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's - Assignees' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-00888
01/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/08/2020).
01/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Transcript Request Form. Corrected TRF due: 5 days. (SC)20-00976
01/09/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SECOND REJECTION PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/10/2020).
01/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Second Notice of Rejection of Deficient Transcript Request Form. (SC)20-01237
01/11/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/12/19. To Court Reporter: Jennifer P. Gerold. (SC)20-01416
01/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for leave to file a response to appellant's docketing statement in excess of one page is granted. The response was filed on January 7, 2020. (SC).20-01495
02/03/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Jennifer P. Gerold stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/12/19. (SC)20-04608
04/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-12999
04/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 8, 2020. (SC).20-13579
04/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (60 days) (SC)20-16146
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 7, 2020. (SC).20-17490
07/01/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate. (SC)20-24400
07/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-25069
07/07/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC)20-25070
07/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Appellant's Opening Brief). Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-25156
07/09/2020MotionFiled Notice of Errata to Appellant's Motion to Consolidate. (SC)20-25434
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to consolidate these two appeals. The motion is denied without prejudice to appellant's right to refile it after resolution of the settlement proceedings in Docket No. 81351. Nos. 79832/81351. (SC).20-26134
08/03/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation for Answering Brief. (DETACHED ANSWERING BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/7/20). (SC)20-28264
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief.20-28270
08/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. (SC)20-28339
08/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the answering brief from the motion and shall filed it separately. (SC)20-29137
08/07/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-29138
09/04/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 22, 2020. (SC)20-32688
09/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Associate Marc Lazo as Counsel for the Appellant. (SC)20-33120
09/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. attorney Marc Y. Lazo of K & L Law Group, P.C shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellant. Nevada attorney Kenneth N. Caldwell of Caldwell Law Firm, PC, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Lazo in this matter. (SC)20-34265
09/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-34626
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: October 19, 2020. (SC)20-34991
10/19/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-38310
10/20/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/16/2020OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-08668
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18899
07/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21567
07/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21567