Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79871
Short Caption:TIFFEE VS. EIGHTH JUDICIAL DIST. CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A796636Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/24/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Due. (SC)
10/24/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-43942
10/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-43944
10/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-43947
11/15/2019Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Thomas Michaelides
11/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-47127
11/19/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:19-47317
11/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC)19-47364
12/02/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-48842
12/10/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: December 23, 2019. (SC).19-49916
12/23/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-51884
02/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-04870
03/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Ex-Parte Motion to Extend Time for Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).20-10781
03/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Filed Order Granting Motion and to File Document. Appellant: Transcript Request Form; Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 2, 2020. (SC)20-11326
04/02/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/30/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-12706
04/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Opening Brief - Appendix Volume I. (SC)20-12707
04/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-12711
05/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file proof of service of the opening brief and appendix that comply with NRAP 25(d). Respondent shall have 37 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-19088
06/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jonathan VanBoskerck as counsel for the Respondent). (SC).20-23562
06/25/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief). (SC).20-23564
06/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Thomas Michaelides shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file proof of service of the opening brief and appendix that comply with NRAP 25(d). Attorney Jonathan Vanboskerck has filed a notice of appearance on behalf of respondent. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Vanboskerck to the docket as counsel of record for respondent. Answering Brief due: July 27, 2020. (SC).20-23651
06/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate Of Mailing (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC)20-24061
07/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-27014
07/24/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-27015
08/27/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Ex- Parte Motion To Extend Time for Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-31574
08/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Reply). (SC)20-31576
08/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 14, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-32020
09/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 9/8/20). (SC)
09/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-32924
09/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-32970
09/08/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-04339
05/06/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC).21-12962
06/01/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15518
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 3, 2021. (SC)21-15518
07/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Seal Record. (SC)Y21-20152