Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76751-COA
Short Caption:MCQUEEN (IRVIN) VS. STATE C/W 76748Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:76748-COA*, 76751-COARelated Case(s):76751, 77357, 77357-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR7614AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/24/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
12/12/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 76748/76751. (COA)19-50393
12/26/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 76748/76751. (COA)19-52196
02/19/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 76748/76751. (COA)20-06800
02/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
02/24/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).