Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0549
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENT TO SCR 214(1)(D) REGARDING EXEMPTION OF CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION REQUIREMENTS OF ATTORNEYS WHO ARE SEVENTY YEARS OF AGE AND OLDERCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Petition Filed
Filed Date:10/24/2019Public Hearing:12/02/2019 at 3:00 PM (Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/24/2019Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Supreme Court Rule 214(1)(d) Regarding Exemption of Continuing Legal Education Requirements for Attorneys who are Seventy Years of Age or Older.19-44112
11/01/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Exhibit A attached. Hearing to be held Monday, December 2, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom in Las Vegas with videoconference to the Nevada Supreme Court in Carson City. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy format due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m., November 25, 2019. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than November 25, 2019.19-44985
11/21/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments/Incoming - Written Comment in Support of Petition by the Board of Governors of the State Bar of Nevada (Francis Flaherty-Chair). (SC)19-47650
11/22/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments/Incoming - Laurence Peter Digesti, Esq. (SC)19-47960
11/27/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments/Incoming - Written Comments by Attorney Gary D. Woodbury.19-48516
12/02/2019Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
12/10/2019Administrative CaseFiled Supplement to ADKT 0549.19-50054