Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79874
Short Caption:SHUE (JOSHUA) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67428
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A798713, C288172Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
10/28/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-44219
11/15/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on October 31, 2019. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (SC)19-46927
11/20/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-47507
12/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)19-49114
12/09/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (A798713). (SC)19-49793
12/09/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 9 (C288172) via FTP. (SC)19-49846
12/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 22 to 28, 30 to 31, 34 to 39 and 52 to 53 (SEALED). (SC)
12/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 333 to 346 (PSI) (SEALED). (SC)
12/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 347 to 362 (Supp. PSI) (SEALED). (SC)
12/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1602 to 1606, 1612 to 1613 and 1779 to 1972 (SEALED). (SC)
03/13/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC)20-10071
04/28/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).