Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77337-COA
Short Caption:PNC BANK, NAT'L ASS'N VS. SFR INVS. POOL 1, LLCCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):77337
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A705949Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/04/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
12/13/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Handling Attorney and Designation of Counsel for Service (Colt Dodrill as counsel for appellant in place of Andrew Bao). (COA).19-50642
02/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (INADVERTENTLY FILED IN THE SUPREME COURT). (COA)20-04534
02/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (COA)20-04655
03/30/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the summary judgment in favor of PNC and remand for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [We direct the clerk of the court to amend the caption for this case to conform to the caption on this order.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB.20-11959
04/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
04/24/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)