Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78824-COA
Short Caption:STROM VS. KELLER (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78824, 79973
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D473850Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/04/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
11/15/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Bulfa stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/08/19. (COA)19-46939
12/02/2019TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 8, 2019. Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting & Transcription. (COA).
12/04/2019TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 22, 2019. Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting and Transcription. (COA).
12/04/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Filed Proper Person Missing Pages of Transcript. (COA).
01/02/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Bulfa stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/03/19, 03/20/14, 04/29/14, 10/02/14, 06/09/16, 07/13/16, 04/17/18, 07/03/18. (SC).20-00118
02/11/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB.20-05702
03/09/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
03/09/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)