Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79953
Short Caption:PANICARO VS. STOREY CTY.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79953-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - 18OC000121EClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/13/2019 / Andrews, JonathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/22/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Charles R. Kozak. Check no. 3113. (SC)
11/06/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-45648
11/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)19-45650
11/13/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonathan L. Andrews. (SC).19-46519
11/22/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: December 11, 2019. (SC)19-47903
12/02/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)19-48723
12/04/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-49185
12/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement). (SC)19-49419
12/05/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service (Settlement Judge). (SC)19-49440
12/06/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-49590
12/09/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-49697
01/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's NRAP 3 (b)(2) Motion to Consolidate Appeals. (Nos. 79953/80264/79266/80267). (SC)20-03047
01/29/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Consolidate Appeals with Supreme Court Case 79953. (Nos. 79953/80264/79266/80267). (SC)20-03994
01/29/2020MotionFiled Errata to Respondents' Opposition to Consolidate Appeals with Supreme Court Case 79953 (Nos. 79953/80264/80266/80267). (SC)20-04016
02/03/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Consolidate Appeals (Nos. 79953/80264/80266/80267). (SC)20-04603
02/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant moves to consolidate these appeals on the grounds that they all involve the same parties, the same district court, and raise similar issues of access to public records. The motion to consolidate is denied. However, the appeals shall be clustered to ensure that they are resolved in a consistent and efficient manner. Nos. 79953/80264/80266/80267. (SC).20-05132
02/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's NRAP 26(b)(1)(A) Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-05519
02/13/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Notice of Nonopposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-06165
02/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 24, 2020. (SC).20-07523
03/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Unavailability. (SC)20-09340
03/25/2020MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant. (SC)20-11539
03/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant due: April 15, 2020. (SC).20-12099
03/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Notice of NonOpposition to Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant. (SC).20-12158
04/09/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Panicaro's NRAP 27(a)(3) Response to Motion to Withdraw. (SC)20-13560
04/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC)20-13801
04/15/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. (SC)20-14179
04/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorney Charles R. Kozak as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to either (1) retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court, or (2) inform this court, in writing, that he will not be retaining new counsel and will be proceeding in pro se. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)20-15468
06/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing and Directing Transmission of Record. This appeal will proceed with appellant acting pro se. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 60 days. (SC).20-22200
07/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Attorney Change of Address and Law Firm. (SC)20-25172
07/31/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)20-28076
08/10/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-29339
09/22/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
10/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-37835
10/15/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing in Part, Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We affirm the court's dismissal order. We therefore reverse this decision with regard to the copy costs, and remand this matter to the district court to determine whether Panicaro should be awarded his copy costs. We dismiss this appeal to the extent Panicaro challenges the post-judgment order denying his motion for an order to show cause." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13237
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2021. (SC)21-13237